Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466001

EP3466001 - MEDIA BUFFERING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - extension statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HAMMARQVIST, Ulf Nils Evert
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17758716.917.08.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US47238
Priority number, dateGB2016001435623.08.2016         Original published format: GB 201614356
US20161533402425.10.2016         Original published format: US201615334024
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018039003
Date:01.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466001
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/875, H04L12/841, H04L12/823
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MEDIENPUFFERUNG[2019/15]
English:MEDIA BUFFERING[2019/15]
French:MISE EN MÉMOIRE TAMPON DE SUPPORTS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
04.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2770504  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0122] *;
 [A]US2005058145  (FLORENCIO DINEI A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0023]; figure 2 *;
 [A]GB2356537  (MITEL CORP [CA]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 11 - line 25 *