blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3491378

EP3491378 - TUNNEL JUNCTIONS IN MICROFLUIDIC ARRAYS FOR MOLECULAR RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.04.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.12.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Straße 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / ASTIER, Yann
6849 Tiffany Common
Livermore, California 94551 / US
02 / TOPOLANCIK, Juraj
405 Cork Harbour Circle
Apartment B
Redwood City, California 94065 / US
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Hildebrandt, Martin K. E.
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
[2019/23]
Application number, filing date17758804.331.07.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017EP69307
Priority number, dateUS201662369704P01.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662369704 P
[2019/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018024670
Date:08.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3491378
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3491378
Date:01.06.2022
Language:EN
[2022/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/487, G01N27/327
[2019/23]
CPC:
G01N27/3278 (EP,US); G01N27/44791 (US); B01L3/502715 (US);
B01L3/50273 (US); G01N33/48721 (EP,US); H10N50/01 (US);
H10N50/80 (US); H10N50/85 (US); B01L2300/0645 (US);
B01L2300/0887 (US); B01L2400/0421 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TUNNELÜBERGÄNGE BEI MIKROFLUIDISCHEN ARRAYS ZUR MOLEKULAREN ERKENNUNG[2019/23]
English:TUNNEL JUNCTIONS IN MICROFLUIDIC ARRAYS FOR MOLECULAR RECOGNITION[2019/23]
French:JONCTIONS DE TUNNEL DANS DES RÉSEAUX MICROFLUIDIQUES POUR RECONNAISSANCE MOLÉCULAIRE[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase01.03.2019National basic fee paid 
01.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
01.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
01.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2022Fee for grant paid
25.04.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.03.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.07.2017
AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CY01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
IT01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
MK01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BE31.07.2022
IE31.07.2022
LU31.07.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
[2024/23]
Former [2024/20]HU31.07.2017
AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CY01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
IT01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BE31.07.2022
IE31.07.2022
LU31.07.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2024/18]HU31.07.2017
AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
IT01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BE31.07.2022
IE31.07.2022
LU31.07.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2024/11]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
IT01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BE31.07.2022
IE31.07.2022
LU31.07.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/33]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BE31.07.2022
IE31.07.2022
LU31.07.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/25]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BE31.07.2022
LU31.07.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/21]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
LU31.07.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/17]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/12]AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/11]AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/09]AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/07]AT01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
Former [2023/02]ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
Former [2022/50]ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
Former [2022/49]ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
Former [2022/47]ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
NO01.09.2022
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2003217934  (HODGES ALASTAIR M [AU], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * paragraphs [0048] , [0049] , [0087]; figures 7-13 *[I] 4,5;
 [A]WO2015161119  (UNIV ARIZONA [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 4,8,15 *
by applicant   - W. ZHAO et al., "Failure Analysis in Magnetic Tunnel Junction Nanopillar with Interfacial Perpendicular Magnetic Anisotropy", Materials, (20160000), vol. 9, no. 41
    - P. TYAGI; E. FRIEBE; C. BAKER, "Advantages of Prefabricated Tunnel Junction-Based Spintronic s Devices", NANO: Brief Reports and Reviews, (20150000), vol. 10, page 1530002
    - BATZER et al., Nucleic Acid Res., (19910000), vol. 19, page 5081
    - OHTSUKA et al., J. Biol. Chern., (19850000), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608
    - ROSSOLINI et al., Mol. Cell. Probes, (19940000), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.