Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3481328

EP3481328 - MULTI-COLORED MILLING BLANK FOR PROSTHETIC DENTAL FIXTURES WHICH ARE SUPPORTED ON AN IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
08.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kulzer GmbH
Leipziger Strasse 2
63450 Hanau / DE
[2019/20]
Inventor(s)01 / BÖHM, Uwe
Gartenfeldstrasse 45a
61350 Bad Homburg / DE
02 / BEYER, Mario
Gartenfeldstr. 26
61350 Bad Homburg / DE
 [2019/20]
Representative(s)Bendele, Tanja
RUHR-IP Patentanwälte
Brucker Holt 58
45133 Essen / DE
[2019/20]
Application number, filing date17761081.301.09.2017
[2019/20]
WO2017EP71974
Priority number, dateDE20161011654605.09.2016         Original published format: DE102016116546
[2019/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018042001
Date:08.03.2018
Language:DE
[2018/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3481328
Date:15.05.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/00, A61C8/00, A61C13/083, A61C13/09
[2019/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
TitleGerman:MEHRFARBIGER FRÄSROHLING FÜR IMPLANTAT-GETRAGENE DENTALE, PROTHETISCHE VERSORGUNGEN[2019/20]
English:MULTI-COLORED MILLING BLANK FOR PROSTHETIC DENTAL FIXTURES WHICH ARE SUPPORTED ON AN IMPLANT[2019/20]
French:ÉBAUCHE POLYCHROME POUR FRAISAGE DESTINÉE À DES RESTAURATIONS PROTHÉTIQUES DENTAIRES SUPPORTÉES PAR IMPLANT[2019/20]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2019National basic fee paid 
11.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/20]
11.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2008274440  (SMITH JEFFREY [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0071]; figures 3-12 *;
 [XI]US5104318  (PICHE JEAN [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,12-17 * column 1, line 40 - column 4, line 38; figures 2-6 * [I] 5-11;
 [XI]WO2010032987  (KO CHAN JOONG [KR]) [X] 1-5,12-17 * abstract * [I] 6-11
by applicantDE3502594