Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467868

EP3467868 - SUPPORT APPARATUS AND SUPPORT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd.
No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100015 / CN
For all designated states
Hefei Xinsheng Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd.
Xinzhan Industrial Park
Hefei
Anhui 230012 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SU, Chih-Wei
No.9 Dize Rd. BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17761425.202.03.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN75450
Priority number, dateCN20161036536627.05.2016         Original published format: CN201610365366
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202097
Date:30.11.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467868
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/263, H01L21/683
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:STÜTZVORRICHTUNG UND STÜTZVERFAHREN[2019/15]
English:SUPPORT APPARATUS AND SUPPORT METHOD[2019/15]
French:APPAREIL DE SUPPORT ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUPPORT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2017Translation filed 
13.09.2017National basic fee paid 
13.09.2017Search fee paid 
13.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2017Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[PX]CN105845609  (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN104617017  (HEFEI BOE OPTOELECTRONICS TECH, et al) [X] 1-17 * description, paragraphs [0049]-[0070], and figures 6-10h *;
 [A]CN105575863  (ADVANCED MICRO-FABRICATION EQUIPMENT INC) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *