blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3500493

EP3500493 - ELECTRIC PROPULSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.04.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.12.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2019/26]
Inventor(s)01 / KUPISZEWSKI, Thomas
One Neumann Way
Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US
02 / MILLER, Brandon Wayne
One Neumann Way
Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US
03 / VONDRELL, Randy M.
1 Neumann Way
Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US
 [2021/20]
Former [2019/26]01 / KUPISZEWSKI, Thomas
One Neumann Way
Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US
02 / MILLER, Brandon, Wayne
One Neumann Way
Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US
03 / VONDRELL, Randy, M.
1 Neumann Way
Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[2019/26]
Application number, filing date17761667.922.08.2017
[2019/26]
WO2017US48000
Priority number, dateUS20161524284422.08.2016         Original published format: US201615242844
[2019/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018039222
Date:01.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3500493
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3500493
Date:19.05.2021
Language:EN
[2021/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.03.2018
ClassificationIPC:B64D27/02, H02J1/10, H02J4/00
[2019/26]
CPC:
B64D27/02 (EP,CN,US); B64D27/24 (CN,US); B60L50/12 (EP,US);
B64D27/026 (EP,CN,US); B64D27/10 (CN); B64D33/08 (CN);
H02J1/102 (US); H02J4/00 (US); B60L2200/10 (US);
B60L2210/30 (US); B64D2205/00 (EP,US); B64D2221/00 (EP,US);
H02J1/082 (US); Y02T50/60 (EP); Y02T50/80 (EP,US);
Y10S903/902 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM[2019/26]
English:ELECTRIC PROPULSION SYSTEM[2019/26]
French:SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/26]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2019National basic fee paid 
22.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/26]
22.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.12.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2021Fee for grant paid
12.04.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)22.02.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.08.2017
AL19.05.2021
AT19.05.2021
CY19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
IT19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
MK19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SI19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IE22.08.2021
LU22.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU22.08.2017
AL19.05.2021
AT19.05.2021
CY19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
IT19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SI19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IE22.08.2021
LU22.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2023/30]AL19.05.2021
AT19.05.2021
CY19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
IT19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SI19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IE22.08.2021
LU22.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/36]AL19.05.2021
AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
IT19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SI19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IE22.08.2021
LU22.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/35]AL19.05.2021
AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SI19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IE22.08.2021
LU22.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/34]AL19.05.2021
AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SI19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
LU22.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/29]AL19.05.2021
AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SI19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
LU22.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/26]AL19.05.2021
AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
LU22.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/23]AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
LU22.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/21]AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
PT20.09.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/18]AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
MC19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
PT20.09.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/10]AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
EE19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
PT20.09.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/09]AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RO19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SK19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/08]AT19.05.2021
CZ19.05.2021
DK19.05.2021
ES19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/07]AT19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
SM19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2022/04]AT19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
NL19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2021/52]AT19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
PL19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2021/51]AT19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
RS19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
IS19.09.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2021/50]AT19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
PT20.09.2021
Former [2021/49]AT19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
HR19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
LV19.05.2021
SE19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
NO19.08.2021
GR20.08.2021
Former [2021/47]AT19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
BG19.08.2021
Former [2021/46]AT19.05.2021
FI19.05.2021
LT19.05.2021
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2432093  (GE AVIAT SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]EP2985901  (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [A] 1-20* figure 1 *;
 [A]US2016070266  (DIVITO ROCCO [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP3048042  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 3-5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.