Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3510168

EP3510168 - SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE DETECTION METHOD AND ASSOCIATED PROBES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
08.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Base4 Innovation Limited
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
[2019/29]
Inventor(s)01 / BALMFORTH, Barnaby
Base4 Innovation Limited
Broers Building
JJ Thompson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
02 / FRAYLING, Cameron Alexander
Base4 Innovation Limited
Broers Building
JJ Thompson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
 [2019/29]
Representative(s)Lau, Sarah Jane
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/29]Briscoe, Paul Brian , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Application number, filing date17765145.206.09.2017
[2019/29]
WO2017EP72308
Priority number, dateEP2016018749306.09.2016         Original published format: EP 16187493
GB2016001891809.11.2016         Original published format: GB 201618918
[2019/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018046521
Date:15.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3510168
Date:17.07.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018
[2019/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2019/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/29]
TitleGerman:EINZELNUKLEOTIDDETEKTIONSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE SONDEN[2019/29]
English:SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE DETECTION METHOD AND ASSOCIATED PROBES[2019/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE NUCLÉOTIDES SIMPLES ET SONDES ASSOCIÉES[2019/29]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2019National basic fee paid 
19.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/29]
19.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2016012789  (BASE4 INNOVATION LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-16 * claims 1,17 * * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0878554  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 US5919630  [ ] (NADEAU JAMES G [US] ET AL) [ ] * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2006088911  (ANTEON CORP [US]; UNIV GEORGETOWN [US]; SKOWRONSKI EVAN [US]; DANIELSE) [A] 1-16 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *;
 [AD]WO2014053853  (BASE4 INNOVATION LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-16 * claims 1-26 * * the whole document *
 [A]  - CUI WANLING ET AL, "A dual amplification fluorescent strategy for sensitive detection of DNA methyltransferase activity based on strand displacement amplification and DNAzyme amplification", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, (20151022), vol. 77, doi:10.1016/J.BIOS.2015.10.040, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 650 - 655, XP029311813 [A] 1-16 * Scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2015.10.040
by applicantWO2014053853
 WO2014053854
 WO2014167323
 WO2014167324
 WO2014111723
 WO2014005385
 WO2016012789
 WO03080861
 WO9418218
    - FAN et al., Nature Reviews Genetics, (20060000), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 632 - 644
    - J. Biol. Chem., (19690000), vol. 244, pages 3019 - 3028