Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3503958

EP3503958 - PORT CONNECTOR FOR MEDICAL WASTE FLUID RECEPTACLES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Allegiance Corporation
1500 Waukegan Road
West Building
Waukegan, IL 60085 / US
[2019/27]
Inventor(s)01 / LAW, Kok Hern
c/o Cardinal Health Inc.
1500 Waukegan Road
Waukegan, IL 60085 / US
02 / DHARMADAS, Rajesh, Gladwin
c/o Cardinal Health Inc.
1500 Waukegan Road
Waukegan, IL 60085 / US
03 / LIE, Wei, Chen
c/o Cardinal Health Inc.
1500 Waukegan Road
Waukegan, IL 60085 / US
 [2019/27]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/27]
Application number, filing date17765308.628.08.2017
[2019/27]
WO2017US48877
Priority number, dateUS201662381010P29.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662381010 P
[2019/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018044781
Date:08.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3503958
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61M39/10, A61J1/14
[2019/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/27]
TitleGerman:AUSGANGSANSCHLUSS FÜR BEHÄLTER FÜR MEDIZINISCHE FLÜSSIGABFÄLLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG[2019/27]
English:PORT CONNECTOR FOR MEDICAL WASTE FLUID RECEPTACLES AND METHODS OF USE[2019/27]
French:CONNECTEUR À ORIFICE POUR RÉCEPTACLES DE FLUIDES USÉS MÉDICAUX ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION[2019/27]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2019National basic fee paid 
31.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/27]
31.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010022986  (BREUER-THAL BARBARA [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-16,18,20 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0032] * [I] 2,9,19;
 [XI]US2015320638  (BECKER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8,10,15-18,20 * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0068] , [0069] * [I] 2,9,19;
 [XI]US5848994  (RICHMOND FRANK M [US]) [X] 1,3-18,20 * figure 8 * * columns 5-6 * [I] 2,9,19;
 [A]EP0711538  (CLINICO GMBH INFUSIONSTECH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0659090  (BAXTER INT [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *