Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3429992

EP3429992 - TRIGONELLINE BASED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sphaera Pharma Pvt. Ltd.
Plot No.32
Sector 5
IMT Manesar
Haryana 122051 / IN
[2019/04]
Inventor(s)01 / DUGAR, Sundeep
Sphaera Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No.32
Sector 5
IMT
Haryana Manesar 122051 / IN
02 / MAHAJAN, Dinesh
Gharota Kalan
District Pathankot
Punjab 143533 / IN
03 / SEN, Somdutta
Sphaera Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Plot No.32
Sector 5
IMT
Haryana Manesar 122051 / IN
 [2019/04]
Representative(s)Daniels, Stefanie Lisa
IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH
Schlossstraße 523-525
41238 Mönchengladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/04]Bläsi, Stefanie Lisa
IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH
Schlossstraße 523-525
41238 Mönchengladbach / DE
Application number, filing date17766001.614.03.2017
[2019/04]
WO2017IN50091
Priority number, dateIN2882DE201514.03.2016         Original published format: IN 2882DE2015
[2019/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017158621
Date:21.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3429992
Date:23.01.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017
[2019/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IN21.09.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07D205/08
[2019/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/04]
TitleGerman:TRIGONELLINBASIERTE VERBINDUNGEN[2019/04]
English:TRIGONELLINE BASED COMPOUNDS[2019/04]
French:COMPOSÉS À BASE DE TRIGONELLINE[2019/04]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2018National basic fee paid 
11.10.2018Search fee paid 
11.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/04]
10.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6559164  (FOTOUHI NADER [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 15-21; compound 12 * [Y] 1-12;
 [Y]WO9715571  (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * figure 1; claims 1,16,17 *
 [Y]  - NICOLAOU K C ET AL, "Chemical synthesis and biological evaluation of C-2 taxoids", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19950308), vol. 117, no. 9, doi:10.1021/JA00114A005, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2409 - 2420, XP002000809 [Y] 1-12 * compounds 31e, 31n, 32 , 34b *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00114a005
 [Y]  - DAVID B. GUTHRIE ET AL, "Water-Soluble Progesterone Analogues Are Effective, Injectable Treatments in Animal Models of Traumatic Brain Injury", ACS MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20120510), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:10.1021/ml200303r, ISSN 1948-5875, pages 362 - 366, XP055115946 [Y] 1-12 * compounds 14,15 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ml200303r
International search[XY]WO9204038  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1-3, 6, 11-12 * paragraphs [0642],[0644], cliam 13cliam 13 * [Y] 4-5, 7-10;
 [Y]US5411984  (KINGSTON DAVID G I [US], et al) [Y] 4-5, 7-10 * Whole document *;
 [A]EP2423215  (SANLUGEN PHARMATECH LTD [CN]) [A] 1-12 * Whole document *;
 [A]EP1336602  (SCARAMUZZINO GIOVANNI [IT]) [A] 1-12 * Whole document *
 [XY]  - H.H.M ABDU-ALLAH et al., "SYNTHESIS OF TRIGONELLINE AND NICOTINAMIDE LINKED PRODRUGS OF 5-AMINOSALICYLIC ACID (5-ASA) WITH ANALGESIC AND ANTI-INFLAMMATORY EFFECTS", Bull. Pharm. Sci., (20051200), vol. 28, pages 237 - 253, XP055424710 [X] 1-3, 6, 11-12 * . page 238,schme 1, chart 2 * [Y] 4-5, 7-10