Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472567

EP3472567 - WIRELESS MECHANISM FOR DETECTING AN OPEN OR CLOSED CONTAINER, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thin Film Electronics ASA
Henrik Ibsens Gate 100
0255 Oslo / NO
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MUKHERJEE, Somnath
406 Sandhurst Drive
Milpitas CA 95035 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
Östra Storgatan 7
553 21 Jönköping / SE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17767916.419.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017IB00909
Priority number, dateUS201662351875P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351875 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017216634
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3472567
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/20, A61M16/00, G06K19/07, G08B13/24
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSER MECHANISMUS ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES OFFENEN ODER GESCHLOSSENEN BEHÄLTERS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/17]
English:WIRELESS MECHANISM FOR DETECTING AN OPEN OR CLOSED CONTAINER, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME[2019/17]
French:MÉCANISME SANS FIL PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER UN CONTENANT OUVERT OU FERMÉ, ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US6107920  (EBERHARDT NOEL H [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 46 - column 11, line 20 *;
 [A]US3827291  (MC CALVEY L) [A] 1-20 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 15; figure 6 *;
 [A]WO2006102678  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0011] - [0026] *;
 [A]US2007069895  (KOH SOO K [SG]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0007] - [0054] *