Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471655

EP3471655 - SCAN BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bloier, Karl
Marktplatz 11
94065 Waldkirchen Bayern / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Lichtnecker, Markus Christoph
Lichtnecker & Lichtnecker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Im Schloßpark Gern 2
84307 Eggenfelden / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17768703.504.09.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP72122
Priority number, dateDE201620104885U05.09.2016         Original published format: DE 202016104885 U
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018042038
Date:08.03.2018
Language:DE
[2018/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471655
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00, A61C9/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SCANBODY[2019/17]
English:SCAN BODY[2019/17]
French:CORPS DE SCANNAGE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
17.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]US2015017600  (BELLANCA JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,11 * figures 3E, 1F * [A] 23 [Y] 10 [I] 12;
 [XAYI]KR101452849B  (RAPHABIO CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,8 * figure 5 * [A] 23 [Y] 10 [I] 12;
 [XAYI]US2012135371  (JAHN DIRK [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * Abstract;; figures 1, 5 * [A] 23 [Y] 10 [I] 7,12;
 [XAI]US2007281283  (LUNDGREN DAN [SE]) [X] 13,14,16-19,21 * figures 9, 10 * [A] 23 [I] 15,20;
 [Y]US2007141531  (DE CLERK RENE [BE]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *;
 [XAI]US2013171586  (ANITUA ALDECOA EDUARDO [ES]) [X] 13-17,19 * figures 2-8 * [A] 23 [I] 20,22