Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3509565

EP3509565 - SUPPLEMENT TO SUPPORT HEALTHY HAIR, SKIN, AND NAILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  03.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
15.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New Chapter, Inc.
90 Technology Drive
Brattleboro, VT 05301 / US
[2019/29]
Inventor(s)01 / TOOMEY, Jennifer, Marie
90 Technology Drive
Brattleboro, Vermont 05301 / US
02 / SCHULICK, Paul
90 Technology Drive
Brattleboro, Vermont 05301 / US
 [2019/29]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/29]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date17771953.111.09.2017
[2019/29]
WO2017US50907
Priority number, dateUS201662393381P12.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662393381 P
[2019/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018049305
Date:15.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3509565
Date:17.07.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018
[2019/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/35, A61K8/9706, A61K8/67, A61K36/074, A61K31/122, A61K31/41, A61Q3/00, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/00, A61K8/9728, A61K36/02, A61K31/4188
[2019/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/29]
TitleGerman:ERGÄNZUNG FÜR DIE UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER GESUNDHEIT VON HAAR, HAUT UND NÄGELN[2019/29]
English:SUPPLEMENT TO SUPPORT HEALTHY HAIR, SKIN, AND NAILS[2019/29]
French:COMPLÉMENT FAVORISANT LA SANTÉ DES CHEVEUX, DE LA PEAU ET DES ONGLES[2019/29]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2019National basic fee paid 
27.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/29]
27.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]CN104839659  (HEALMING HEALTH SCIENCE CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] - paragraph [0006] *;
 [Y]WO02100329  (PENINSULA INTERNATIONAL LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, line 7 - page 7, line 14 * * page 10, line 10 - line 14; examples 4,5,7 *;
 [Y]WO2012120290  (SANA PHARMA AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 35, line 6 - line 21; example 3; claims 13-21 * * page 39, line 19 - line 30 *
 [Y]  - "Dietary supplement", GNPD, MINTEL, (201409), Database accession no. 2662857, XP002775410 [Y] 6,7,14 * Product description; Ingredients *
 [Y]  - "Whole-Food Multivitamin Tablets for Soothing Strees Support", GNPD, MINTEL, (201109), Database accession no. 1614021, XP002775411 [Y] 8,9,14 * Product description; Ingredients *
 [Y]  - "Skin, hair and nails food supplement", GNPD, MINTEL, (201111), Database accession no. 1676088, XP002775412 [Y] 6-9,14 * Product description; Ingredients *
by applicantUS2011262570