Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3529165

EP3529165 - SEALED POUCH FOR DISPENSING MATERIAL AND METHOD TO OPEN A SEALED POUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/35]A SEALED POUCH FOR DISPENSING MATERIAL
[2019/45]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.10.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
A Company Registered In England And Wales
Under Company No. 41424 Of Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
[2019/35]
Inventor(s)01 / JAKUB, Pedzinski
Unilever Deutschland Holding GmbH
Knorrstrasse 1
74074 Heilbronn / DE
 [2019/35]
Representative(s)van den Brom, Coenraad Richard
Unilever Patent Group
Bronland 14
6708 WH Wageningen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/35]van den Brom, Coenraad Richard
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date17772441.628.09.2017
[2019/35]
WO2017EP74661
Priority number, dateEP2016019442318.10.2016         Original published format: EP 16194423
[2019/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018072982
Date:26.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3529165
Date:28.08.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018
[2019/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:B65D75/58
[2019/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/35]
TitleGerman:VERSIEGELTER BEUTEL ZUR AUSGABE VON MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÖFFNEN EINES VERSIEGELTEN BEUTELS[2019/45]
English:SEALED POUCH FOR DISPENSING MATERIAL AND METHOD TO OPEN A SEALED POUCH[2019/45]
French:SACHET SCELLÉ PERMETTANT DE DISTRIBUER UN MATÉRIAU ET PROCÉDÉ D'OUVERTURE D'UN SACHET SCELLÉ[2019/45]
Former [2019/35]VERSIEGELTER BEUTEL ZUR AUSGABE VON MATERIAL
Former [2019/35]A SEALED POUCH FOR DISPENSING MATERIAL
Former [2019/35]SACHET SCELLÉ PERMETTANT DE DISTRIBUER UN MATÉRIAU
Entry into regional phase20.03.2019National basic fee paid 
20.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/35]
20.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]GB1297302  (VAMUS N.V.) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 29 - line 113 * * figure .; claim 6 *;
 [A]GB685379  (WINGFOOT CORP) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 9 - line 117 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2014003108  (HOSOKAWA YOKO KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figure 12 *;
 [A]JP2007297073  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US2329360  (SALFISBERG LEROY L) [A] 1-12 * page 1, column 2, line 42 - line 49 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2011064338  (SURDZIEL AGATA [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 2,3 *
by applicantGB1297302
 WO2014003108