blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3438671

EP3438671 - SPECIMEN INSPECTION AUTOMATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.12.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.11.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
16.02.2024Change - inventorpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi High-Tech Corporation
17-1, Toranomon 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6409 / JP
[2020/25]
Former [2019/06]For all designated states
Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation
24-14 Nishishimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8717 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KINUGAWA Kohei
Tokyo 105-6409 / JP
02 / KAMBARA Katsuhiro
Tokyo 105-6409 / JP
03 / YAMAGATA Toshiki
Tokyo 105-6409 / JP
 [2024/12]
Former [2019/06]01 / KINUGAWA Kohei
c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
24-14
Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8717 / JP
02 / KAMBARA Katsuhiro
c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
24-14
Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8717 / JP
03 / YAMAGATA Toshiki
c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
24-14
Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8717 / JP
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2019/06]
Application number, filing date17773529.719.01.2017
[2019/06]
WO2017JP01670
Priority number, dateJP2016006624829.03.2016         Original published format: JP 2016066248
[2019/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017168979
Date:05.10.2017
Language:JA
[2017/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3438671
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3438671
Date:20.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.10.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2019
ClassificationIPC:G01N35/04, G01N35/02, G01N35/00, B01L9/06
[2019/48]
CPC:
G01N35/00732 (EP); G01N35/04 (US); G01N35/00584 (US);
G01N35/02 (US); G01N35/021 (EP); B01L9/06 (EP);
G01N2035/00752 (EP); G01N2035/0406 (EP); G01N2035/041 (EP);
G01N2035/0413 (EP); G01N2035/0462 (US); G01N2035/0465 (EP);
G01N35/0099 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2019/06]G01N35/04, G01N35/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROBENINSPEKTIONAUTOMATISIERUNGSSYSTEM[2019/06]
English:SPECIMEN INSPECTION AUTOMATION SYSTEM[2019/06]
French:SYSTÈME D'AUTOMATISATION D'INSPECTION D'ÉCHANTILLON[2019/06]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2018Translation filed 
17.09.2018National basic fee paid 
17.09.2018Search fee paid 
17.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/06]
19.05.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2024Fee for grant paid
08.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5941366  (QUINLAN MICHEL G [CA], et al) [Y] 1-6 * columns 5, 6; figures 4, 5 *;
 [Y]WO2015064540  (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 38]; figures 1, 2, 5, 8, 9 *;
 [Y]EP2896965  (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [Y] 5* paragraph [0026]; figure 2 *
International search[A]JPH07239333  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , paragraph [0040]; fig. 14 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010271204  (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2013099538  (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0071] to [0073]; fig. 1 & US 2014/0294699 A1 paragraphs [0084] to [0086]; fig. 1 & EP 2799885 A1 & CN 104024864 A *;
 [A]WO2015064540  (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * , paragraph [0038]; fig. 2 & US 2016/0244269 A1 paragraph [0087]; fig. 2 & EP 3064947 A1 *;
 [PA]WO2016158122  (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-6* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *
ExaminationJPH07239333
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.