Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3438811

EP3438811 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 10.07.2019 [2019/28]
07.06.2019Change - extension statespublished on 10.07.2019 [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2019/06]
Inventor(s)01 / TOTSUKA Atsushi
C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2
Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2019/06]
Representative(s)Spurr, Andrew Jonathan
Canon Europe Ltd
Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge UB11 1ET / GB
[2019/06]
Application number, filing date17773825.920.02.2017
[2019/06]
WO2017JP06142
Priority number, dateJP2016007260031.03.2016         Original published format: JP 2016072600
[2019/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017169277
Date:05.10.2017
Language:JA
[2017/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3438811
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/12, B41J2/01, B41J2/21, G06T1/00, H04N1/46, H04N1/60
[2019/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/06]
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/06]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD[2019/06]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE[2019/06]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2018Translation filed 
31.10.2018National basic fee paid 
31.10.2018Search fee paid 
31.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
31.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2009012411  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-3, 9, 13-14, 19-25 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0047], [0052] to [0053]; fig. 10 to 11, 17 (Family: none) * [Y] 4-8, 10-12, 15-18;
 [Y]JP2012081638  (CANON KK) [Y] 4-8, 10-12, 17-18 * , paragraphs [0038] to [0049] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2010186344  (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD) [Y] 10-12, 15-16 * , paragraphs [0024], [0058] to [0118] (Family: none) *