Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3437899

EP3437899 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/06]
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUNAGA, Midori
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/06]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/06]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17774745.824.03.2017
[2019/06]
WO2017JP11966
Priority number, dateJP2016006378728.03.2016         Original published format: JP 2016063787
[2019/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017170208
Date:05.10.2017
Language:JA
[2017/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3437899
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.10.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/13, B60C11/03, B60C11/12
[2019/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/06]
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2019/06]
English:TIRE[2019/06]
French:PNEU[2019/06]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2018Translation filed 
23.10.2018National basic fee paid 
23.10.2018Search fee paid 
23.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
23.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/06]
13.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2014012485  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] *;
 [AD]WO2012090917  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] *;
 EP2660079  [ ] (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] *;
 [A]JP2004224268  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
International search[A]WO2012090917  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * , fig. 1 to 10 & JP 5650761 B2 & US 2013/0276947 A1 fig. 1 to 10 & EP 2660079 A1 & CN 103260903 A & ES 2592516 T *;
 [A]JP2004224268  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-11 * , fig. 1 to 13 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008302740  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-11 * , fig. 1 to 14 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012116339  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-11 * , fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014218232  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-11 * , fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2008114668  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * , fig. 1 to 26 & JP 2013-249065 A & US 2010/0038001 A1 fig. 1 to 26 & EP 2141031 A1 & KR 10-2009-0113332 A & CN 101631686 A & ES 2571030 T *;
 [A]US2015343849  (TANAKA KAORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * , fig. 1 to 12 & JP 2016-68635 A & EP 2949482 A1 & CN 105313602 A *
by applicantWO2012090917
 JP2016063787