Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3437732

EP3437732 - PARTICULATE WATER ABSORBING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
[2019/06]
Inventor(s)01 / TORII Kazushi
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
02 / TAMAKI Mariko
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
03 / TAKAGI Daisuke
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
04 / HORIMOTO Yuichiro
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
05 / KOBAYASHI Taishi
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
06 / FUJIMOTO Taku
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
07 / KITANO Takahiro
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
08 / IWAMURA Taku
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
09 / KAWADA Hiroki
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
10 / GOTO Hiroyuki
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
11 / NAKAJIMA Yasuhisa
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
12 / IKEUCHI Hiroyuki
c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD.
992-1
Aza-Nishioki
Okinohama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP
 [2019/06]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/06]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date17775142.728.03.2017
[2019/06]
WO2017JP12752
Priority number, dateJP2016006376328.03.2016         Original published format: JP 2016063763
JP2016019492130.09.2016         Original published format: JP 2016194921
JP2016019492230.09.2016         Original published format: JP 2016194922
[2019/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017170605
Date:05.10.2017
Language:JA
[2017/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3437732
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.10.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:B01J20/28, A61F13/53, A61L15/60, B01J20/26, B01J20/30, C08F20/06, C08F220/06
[2019/42]
Former International [2019/06]B01J20/28, A61F13/53, A61L15/60, B01J20/26, B01J20/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/06]
TitleGerman:TEILCHENFÖRMIGES WASSERABSORBIERENDES MITTEL[2019/06]
English:PARTICULATE WATER ABSORBING AGENT[2019/06]
French:AGENT D'ABSORPTION D'EAU PARTICULAIRE[2019/06]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2018Translation filed 
24.10.2018National basic fee paid 
24.10.2018Search fee paid 
24.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
24.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]WO2013002387  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * , claims; paragraphs [0151] to [0160], [0247] to [0282], [0285] to [0288], [0296] to [0305], [0314], [0318] & US 2014/0193641 A1 paragraphs [0263] to [0278], [0398] to [0409], [0417] to [0433], [0436] to [0439], [0447] to [0455]; tables 1, 2, 4; claims & EP 2727953 A1 & CN 103619919 A & KR 10-2014-0038998 A *;
 [A]JP2014098172  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [A] 1-19 * , claims; paragraphs [0162] to [0169], [0287] to [0323], [0345] to [0346], [0366], [0406] & US 2011/0313113 A1 paragraphs [0367] to [0388]; tables 1, 3, 4, 5; claims & JP 2014-237846 A & JP 2016-211009 A & JP 2015-83693 A & US 2012/0258851 A1 & US 2014/0296465 A1 & US 2013/0026412 A1 & US 2016/0332141 A1 & US 2013/0101851 A1 & US 2015/0259494 A1 & WO 2010/095427 A1 & WO 2011/078298 A1 & WO 2011/126079 A1 & WO 2012/002455 A1 & WO 2010/095427 A1 & EP 2399944 A1 & EP 2518092 A1 & EP 2557095 A1 & EP 3115382 A1 & EP 2589613 A1 & CN 102317329 A & CN 102712712 A & KR 10-2012-0132475 A & CN 104231144 A & CN 102822209 A & KR 10-2013-0093477 A & CN 104212105 A *;
 [A]JP2015083693  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [A] 1-19 * , claims; paragraphs [0048] to [0053], [0097] to [0107], [0240] to [0275], [0300] to [0305], [0318] to [0321] & US 2013/0026412 A1 paragraphs [0164] to [0168], [0227] to [0238], [0453] to [0488], [0513] to [0518]; tables 1, 2, 3; claims & JP 2014-98172 A & US 2016/0332141 A1 & US 2012/0258851 A1 & WO 2011/126079 A1 & WO 2011/078298 A1 & WO 2011/078298 A1 & EP 2557095 A1 & EP 3115382 A1 & EP 2518092 A1 & CN 102822209 A & KR 10-2013-0093477 A & CN 104212105 A & CN 102712712 A & KR 10-2012-0132475 A *;
 [A]JP2009534483  (Evonik Stockhausen GmbH) [A] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0101] to [0107] & US 2009/0105389 A1 paragraphs [0148] to [0153]; table 1 & JP 2009-534482 A & US 2009/0227741 A1 & US 2014/0350191 A1 & WO 2007/121941 A2 & WO 2007/121937 A2 & EP 2012843 A1 & EP 2015788 A1 & DE 102006019157 A1 & CN 101100526 A & CN 101113208 A & KR 10-2009-0015068 A & KR 10-2009-0015070 A & TW 200804485 A & TW 200806341 A & CN 102746519 A *;
 [A]US2013017945  (BRAUN MARKUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0113] to [0138]; table A; paragraphs [0149] to [0154], [0157] to [0160]; table B; paragraphs [0167] to [0172], [0175] to [0184], [0187] to [0190]; table C (Family: none) *
by applicantWO2011126079
 WO2015030129
 WO2015030130
 WO2015129917
 JPH1160975
 WO2007004529
 US7638570
 US5669894
 WO2005016393
 WO2004096304
 WO2011034146
 WO2015152299
 US2008161512
 WO2009123197
 US2008194863
 US2005215734
 US6241928
 WO2011040530
 US7265190
 US4893999
 US6987151
 US6710141
 WO2006100300
 WO2011025012
 WO2011025013
 WO2011111657
 US7183456
 WO2005075070
 US7108916
 EP0942014
 EP1108745
 WO2009005114
 US2006204755
 JPH09235378
 JP2010142808
 JP2016063762
 JP2016194921
 JP2016194922
    - Glossary of Technical Terms in Japanese Industrial Standards, page 2002