Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466050

EP3466050 - IMPROVED VIDEO STABILIZATION FOR MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
22.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LIANG, Chia-Kai
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / TU, Xue
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
03 / CHU, Lun-Cheng
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
04 / WEI, Jianing
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Thorniley, Peter
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date17778027.718.09.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US52015
Priority number, dateUS20161526944719.09.2016         Original published format: US201615269447
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018053400
Date:22.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466050
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/232
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE VIDEOSTABILISIERUNG FÜR MOBILE VORRICHTUNGEN[2019/15]
English:IMPROVED VIDEO STABILIZATION FOR MOBILE DEVICES[2019/15]
French:STABILISATION VIDÉO AMÉLIORÉE DESTINÉE À DES DISPOSITIFS MOBILES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2014211028  (JEFREMOV ANDREI [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,17 * claim 1 * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0064] * [Y] 5-7,13-16,19,20 [I] 3,4,8,9,12,18;
 [A]US2015206289  (WANG JUE [US], et al) [A] 3,8,16 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2014204228  (YOKOKAWA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 5-7,13-16,19,20 * claim 7 * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0182] *;
 [A]US2013308002  (JIANG MING [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1, 10, 15 * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [A]US2012120264  (LEE YUN-GU [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1, 17 * * paragraph [0059] *
 [A]  - TEHRANI MAHDI ABBASPOUR ET AL, "Undistorting Foreground Objects in Wide Angle Images", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE, (20131209), doi:10.1109/ISM.2013.17, pages 46 - 52, XP032570665 [A] 4,12,18 * Section B; page 48, column right *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISM.2013.17