Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3466050


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 Change: Validation states published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
22.11.2019 Change - extension states published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
01.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.07.2019 Amendment by applicant
10.04.2019 Change - representative
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
09.04.2019 Change - representative
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
04.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
07.01.2019 Change - representative
07.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
07.04.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
24.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication