Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468268

EP3468268 - METHOD FOR SELECTING, IN SELECTION PERIOD, SUBFRAME EXCLUDING SUBFRAME RELATING TO SUBFRAME IN WHICH TRANSMISSION HAS BEEN PERFORMED DURING SENSING PERIOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND TERMINAL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128 Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-Gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Seungmin
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / SEO, Hanbyul
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / CHAE, Hyukjin
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
04 / KIM, Youngtae
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17779397.307.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017KR03844
Priority number, dateUS201662385962P10.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662385962 P
US201662385967P10.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662385967 P
US201662393158P12.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662393158 P
US201662400620P27.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662400620 P
US201662400683P28.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662400683 P
US201662401188P29.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662401188 P
US201662403048P30.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662403048 P
US201662403673P03.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662403673 P
US201662406373P10.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662406373 P
US201662406468P11.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662406468 P
US201662421401P14.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662421401 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017176097
Date:12.10.2017
Language:KO
[2017/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468268
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/02, H04W74/08
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINES HILFSRAHMENS IN DER AUSWAHLPERIODE MIT AUSSCHLUSS EINES HILFSRAHMENS IN BEZUG AUF EINEN HILFSRAHMEN, IN DEM EINE ÜBERTRAGUNG WÄHREND DER ERFASSUNGSPERIODE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM STATTGEFUNDEN HAT, UND ENDGERÄT MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR SELECTING, IN SELECTION PERIOD, SUBFRAME EXCLUDING SUBFRAME RELATING TO SUBFRAME IN WHICH TRANSMISSION HAS BEEN PERFORMED DURING SENSING PERIOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND TERMINAL USING SAME[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION, DANS UNE PÉRIODE DE SÉLECTION, D'UNE SOUS-TRAME EXCLUANT UNE SOUS-TRAME RELATIVE À UNE SOUS-TRAME DANS LAQUELLE UNE TRANSMISSION A ÉTÉ EFFECTUÉE PENDANT UNE PÉRIODE DE DÉTECTION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET TERMINAL L'UTILISANT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2016018009  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * See paragraphs [101]-[173]; and figures 6, 7. *;
 [A]US2015334760  (SARTORI PHILIPPE [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * See paragraphs [0043]-[0058]; and figures 5-8. *
 [A]  - ZTE, "Discussion on V2V SPS Resource Scheme", R1-162413, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 Meeting #84bis, Busan, Korea, (20160402), XP051080186 [A] 1-11 * See sections 1-3. *
 [A]  - CATT, "Discussion on UE Autonomous Resource Allocation in PC5-based V2V", R1-162267, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #84bis, Busan, Korea, (20160402), XP051080072 [A] 1-11 * See sections 2.2, 2.3. *
 [A]  - "Discussion on Details of Sensing with Semi-persistent Transmission", R1-163176, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #84bis, Busan, Korea, (20160402), XP051080574 [A] 1-11 * See sections 1, 2; and figure 1. *