blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3468268 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3468268



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1205
26.03.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
26.03.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
24.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
22.01.2019 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.01.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
07.01.2019 Description Search / examination 143
07.01.2019 Drawings Search / examination 39
07.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.08.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
16.08.2018 Notification of withdrawal of priority claim Search / examination 1
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 82
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 65
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 86
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 77
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 82
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 81
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 89
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 87
31.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 63
12.10.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.10.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
12.10.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 130