Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3468268


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.01.2020 Supplementary search report published on  22.01.2020 [2020/04]
20.12.2019 Change - classification published on  22.01.2020 [2020/04]
20.12.2019 Change - classification published on  22.01.2020 [2020/04]
15.11.2019 Change: Validation states published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
15.11.2019 Change - extension states published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
29.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
07.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
15.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
07.01.2019 Change - representative
07.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
18.08.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
31.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication