blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3468268 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780041795 CN201780055658 EP17779396 EP17779397 EP17779398 EP17779399



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2018071549Global Dossier 19.04.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201662406468 11.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2017176099Global Dossier 12.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2017176098Global Dossier 12.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2017176097Global Dossier 12.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2017176096Global Dossier 12.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2017176095Global Dossier 12.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019313374Global Dossier 10.10.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201716314954 07.04.2017
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03844 07.04.2017
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019246249Global Dossier 08.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
US201716316542 07.04.2017
WO2017KR03846 07.04.2017
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019222981Global Dossier 18.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201916316542 09.01.2019
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201916362109 22.03.2019
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03846 07.04.2017
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019222980Global Dossier 18.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201816091891 05.10.2018
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201916362007 22.03.2019
US201662382307 01.09.2016
WO2017KR03845 07.04.2017
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019191461Global Dossier 20.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201916283167 22.02.2019
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03843 07.04.2017
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019110177Global Dossier 11.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201716091891 07.04.2017
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
WO2017KR03845 07.04.2017
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019090250Global Dossier 21.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662381593 31.08.2016
WO2017KR03842 07.04.2017
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201716091853 04.04.2017
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190007066Global Dossier 21.01.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03843 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190003774Global Dossier 09.01.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
WO2017KR03846 07.04.2017
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190000891Global Dossier 03.01.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03844 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20180120732Global Dossier 06.11.2018A
Priority number Date
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
WO2017KR03845 07.04.2017
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019526995Global Dossier 19.09.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03844 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3512246Global Dossier 17.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03843 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3468272Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
WO2017KR03846 07.04.2017
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3432657Global Dossier 23.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
WO2017KR03845 07.04.2017
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109792640Global Dossier 21.05.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03843 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109417777Global Dossier 01.03.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03844 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3036351Global Dossier 12.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03843 07.04.2017
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662334444 10.05.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662384185 06.09.2016
US201662381593 31.08.2016
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662348127 09.06.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662335656 12.05.2016
US201662382743 01.09.2016
US201662378745 24.08.2016
US201662382307 01.09.2016
US201662379225 24.08.2016
US201662376373 17.08.2016
US201662379263 25.08.2016
US201662345789 05.06.2016
US201662319733 07.04.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
US201662341686 26.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3468268Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03844 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2017248062 18.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03843 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112019004649 18.06.2019A2
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03843 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2019002663 04.07.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03843 07.04.2017
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201762475234 23.03.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201901833Y 29.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
WO2017KR03843 07.04.2017
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CL2019000583 10.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662403048 30.09.2016
US201662421401 14.11.2016
US201662393158 12.09.2016
US201662385962 10.09.2016
US201662401188 29.09.2016
US201662403673 03.10.2016
US201662406468 11.10.2016
US201662406373 10.10.2016
US201662385967 10.09.2016
US201662400683 28.09.2016
US201662400620 27.09.2016