Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3440524

EP3440524 - VOLTAGE REGULATION FOR MULTI-PHASE POWER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Intelligent Power Limited
30 Pembroke Road
Dublin 4 / IE
[2019/07]
Inventor(s)01 / DALEY, Daniel, Joseph
479 N. Hine Ave.
Waukesha, WI 53188 / US
02 / SAUER, Daniel, Michael
501 N. Holden St.
Port Washington, WI 53074 / US
03 / RAPANT, Fred, Joseph
1327 Marion Ave.
South Milwaukee, WI 53172 / US
 [2019/07]
Representative(s)Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/07]Sach, Greg Robert
Sach & Associates
Siedlungsstrasse 4a
85253 Erdweg / DE
Application number, filing date17779809.706.04.2017
[2019/07]
WO2017US26325
Priority number, dateUS201662320064P08.04.2016         Original published format: US 201662320064 P
[2019/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017176978
Date:12.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3440524
Date:13.02.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017
[2019/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU12.10.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:G05F1/14, G01R15/14, H02J3/12, H01F29/02, H01F27/40, H01F38/38, H02M5/12
[2019/47]
Former International [2019/07]G05F1/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/07]
TitleGerman:SPANNUNGSREGELUNG FÜR MEHRPHASIGE ENERGIESYSTEME[2019/07]
English:VOLTAGE REGULATION FOR MULTI-PHASE POWER SYSTEMS[2019/07]
French:RÉGULATION DE TENSION POUR SYSTÈMES D'ALIMENTATION POLYPHASÉS[2019/07]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2018National basic fee paid 
05.11.2018Search fee paid 
05.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US2013234696  (BRYSON MICHAEL B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0103]; figure 12 *;
 [A]US2006028185  (HERNANDEZ AUGUSTO D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0046]; figure 4 *;
 [A]CN1238585  (SHENYANG POLYTECH COLLEGE [CN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[A]US2013229158  (DALEY DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15;
 [A]US8850233  (SU SHENG-CHIEH [TW], et al) [A] 1-15;
 [A]US8400778  (HSING MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-15;
 [A]US2011051479  (BREEN JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15