Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3497630

EP3497630 - PROCESSING SEQUENCES USING CONVOLUTIONAL NEURAL NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  17.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
08.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deepmind Technologies Limited
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DEN OORD, Aaron Gerard Antonius
7 Pancras Square
London N1C 4AG / GB
02 / DIELEMAN, Sander Etienne Lea
7 Pancras Square
London N1C 4AG / GB
03 / KALCHBRENNER, Nal Emmerich
7 Pancras Square
London N1C 4AG / GB
04 / SIMONYAN, Karen
6 Pancras Square
London N1C 4AG / GB
05 / VINYALS, Oriol
6 Pancras Square
London N1C 4AG / GB
06 / ESPEHOLT, Lasse
7 Pancras Square
London N1C 4AG / GB
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)Martin, Philip John
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
[2019/25]
Application number, filing date17780544.706.09.2017
[2019/25]
WO2017US50335
Priority number, dateUS201662384123P06.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662384123 P
[2019/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018048945
Date:15.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3497630
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06N3/04
[2019/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/25]
TitleGerman:VERARBEITUNGSSEQUENZEN MIT VERWENDUNG VON NEURONALEN KONVOLUTIONSNETZWERKEN[2019/25]
English:PROCESSING SEQUENCES USING CONVOLUTIONAL NEURAL NETWORKS[2019/25]
French:SÉQUENCES DE TRAITEMENT UTILISANT DES RÉSEAUX NEURONAUX CONVOLUTIFS[2019/25]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2019National basic fee paid 
13.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/25]
13.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]CA2810457  (PENN GERALD BRADLEY [CA], et al) [I] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] *;
 [A]  - Aäron Van Den Oord ET AL, "Pixel Recurrent Neural Networks", (20160819), pages 1 - 11, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1601.06759.pdf, (20171218), XP055435831 [A] 1-26 * abstract * * section "3.3. Residual Connections" * * section "3.2. Diagonal BiLSTM" *
 [XP]  - AARON VAN DEN OORD ET AL, "WaveNet: A Generative Model for Raw Audio", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20160912), XP080725972 [XP] 1-26 * the whole document *