blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3519518

EP3519518 - PRIMER COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2023Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.10.2023  [2023/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jotun A/S
P.O. Box 2021
3202 Sandefjord / NO
[2019/32]
Inventor(s)01 / MARTINSEN, Morten
JOTUN A/S
P.O. Box 2021
3202 Sandefjord / NO
 [2019/32]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2019/32]
Application number, filing date17780683.328.09.2017
[2019/32]
WO2017EP74639
Priority number, dateEP2016019135329.09.2016         Original published format: EP 16191353
[2019/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018060336
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3519518
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3519518
Date:13.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2018
ClassificationIPC:C09D183/06, C08G77/16, C08G77/18, C08L83/06
[2019/32]
CPC:
C08L83/04 (EP,US); C09D183/04 (EP,KR); C08G77/12 (KR);
C08G77/16 (EP,KR); C08G77/18 (EP,KR); C08J7/0427 (KR);
C08J7/043 (KR); C08J7/06 (KR); C08K3/08 (KR);
C08K5/541 (KR); C08K5/5419 (KR); C08K5/544 (KR);
C09D183/06 (US); C09D5/002 (KR,US); C09D7/20 (US);
C09D7/61 (US); C08K2003/0893 (EP,KR); C09D5/084 (US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L83/04, C08K3/08, C08K5/544 (EP,US);
C09D183/04, C08K3/08, C08K5/544 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PRIMER-BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2020/07]
English:PRIMER COATING COMPOSITION[2019/32]
French:COMPOSITION DE COUCHE PRIMAIRE[2020/07]
Former [2019/32]PRIMERBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG
Former [2019/32]COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT D'APPRÊT
Entry into regional phase16.04.2019National basic fee paid 
16.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
16.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.02.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2020Fee for grant paid
31.03.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.09.2017
AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MK13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE28.09.2020
LU28.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
[2023/41]
Former [2022/33]HU28.09.2017
AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MK13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE28.09.2020
LU28.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
Former [2022/28]HU28.09.2017
AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE28.09.2020
LU28.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
Former [2022/27]HU28.09.2017
AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE28.09.2020
LU28.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
Former [2021/37]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE28.09.2020
LU28.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
Former [2021/36]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU28.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
Former [2021/35]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU28.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
Former [2021/27]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU28.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT13.05.2020
IS13.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS13.09.2020
Cited inInternational search[Y]BE867050  (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [Y] 1-16 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 5 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 2 * * page 10, lines 15-23 * * example 5 *;
 [Y]DE4235323  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, lines 19-35,46-58 * * page 3, lines 3-15,49-61 * * page 4, lines 4-10,20-23 * * example 1 *;
 [A]JP2008175241  (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2011102359  (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [Y] 1-16* abstract *
by applicantBE1008926
 WO2014032844
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.