Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3519416

EP3519416 - CHROMANE, ISOCHROMANE AND DIHYDROISOBENZOFURAN DERIVATIVES AS mGluR2-NEGATIVE ALLOSTERIC MODULATORS, COMPOSITIONS, AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
[2019/32]
Inventor(s)01 / SEBHAT, Iyassu, K.
149 Essex Street
Apt. 6W
Jersey City, New Jersey 07302 / US
02 / ARASAPPAN, Ashok
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US
03 / HOYT, Scott, B.
1515 N. Queen Street
1217
Arlington, Virginia 22209 / US
04 / WILKENING, Robert, R.
11 Salter Place
Maplewood, New Jersey 07040 / US
05 / DEMONG, Duane
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
 [2019/32]
Representative(s)Povey, Alexander W.G.
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
European Patents
Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
[2019/32]
Application number, filing date17781253.425.09.2017
[2019/32]
WO2017US53155
Priority number, dateUS201662400150P27.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662400150 P
[2019/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018063955
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3519416
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:C07D491/04, C07D491/18, A61K31/436, A61P25/00
[2019/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
Extension statesBA29.04.2019
ME29.04.2019
Validation statesMA29.04.2019
MD29.04.2019
TitleGerman:CHROMAN-, ISOCHROMAN- UND DIHYDROISOBENZOFURANDERIVATE ALS MGLUR2-NEGATIVE ALLOSTERISCHE MODULATOREN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2019/32]
English:CHROMANE, ISOCHROMANE AND DIHYDROISOBENZOFURAN DERIVATIVES AS mGluR2-NEGATIVE ALLOSTERIC MODULATORS, COMPOSITIONS, AND THEIR USE[2019/32]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE CHROMANE, D'ISOCHROMANE ET DE DIHYDROISOBENZOFURANE EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS ALLOSTÉRIQUES NÉGATIFS DE MGLUR2, COMPOSITIONS ET LEUR UTILISATION[2019/32]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2019National basic fee paid 
29.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
29.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2016029454  (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * pages 1-3; example - *;
 [A]  - ANDREW S. FELTS ET AL, "Design of 4-Oxo-1-aryl-1,4-dihydroquinoline-3-carboxamides as Selective Negative Allosteric Modulators of Metabotropic Glutamate Receptor Subtype 2", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20151125), vol. 58, no. 22, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b01371, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 9027 - 9040, XP055310834 [A] 1-30 * table - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b01371
by applicantWO2016032921
 WO2013066736
 US2008188521
 WO2007038865
 WO9613500
 CA2169231
    - HIGGINS et al., Neuropharmacology, (20040000), vol. 46, pages 907 - 917
    - GOELDNER et al., Neuropharmacology, (20130000), vol. 64, pages 337 - 346
    - MAREK, Eur JPharmacol, (20100000), vol. 639, pages 81 - 90
    - LYNCH et al., Exp Neurol, (19970000), vol. 145, pages 89 - 92
    - CELANIRE et al., Expert Opin Ther Patents, (20150000), vol. 25, pages 69 - 90
    - CHAKI et al., Neuropharmacology, (20040000), vol. 46, pages 457 - 67
    - CAMPO et al., JNeurogenet, (20110000), vol. 25, pages 152 - 66
    - SHIMAZAKI et al., Eur JPharmacol, (20040000), vol. 501, pages 121 - 5
    - IIJIMA et al., Psychopharmacology (Berl, (20070000), vol. 190, pages 233 - 9
    - AHNAOU et al., Neuropharmacology, (20160000), vol. 103, pages 290 - 305
    - PRITCHETT et al., PLoS One, (20150000), vol. 10, page e0125523
    - CHIECHIO, Adv Pharmacol, (20160000), vol. 75, pages 63 - 89
    - T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", A.C.S. Symposium Series, (19870000), vol. 14
    - T. HIGUCHI; W. STELLA, "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", A.C.S. Symposium Series, vol. 14
    - S. BERGE et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, no. 1, pages 1 - 19
    - P. GOULD, International J. of Pharmaceutics, (19860000), vol. 33, pages 201 - 217
    - The Orange Book, Food & Drug Administration