Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469386

EP3469386 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING THE AMPLITUDE AND PHASE DELAY OF A SINUSOIDAL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Office National d'Etudes et de Recherches Aérospatiales
Chemin de la Hunière
91120 Palaiseau / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / GUERARD, Jean
23 Avenue Gounod
91260 JUVISY-SUR-ORGE / FR
02 / VERLHAC, Béatrice
76 Boulevard Rodin
92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR
03 / LAVENUS, Pierre
41 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92260 FONTENAY AUX ROSES / FR
04 / LEVY, Raphaël
48 Rue Raymond Losserand
75014 PARIS / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17783903.209.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017FR51464
Priority number, dateFR2016005533010.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655330
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017212187
Date:14.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3469386
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01R19/04, G01R19/175, G01R25/00, G06F17/12, G06F17/16, G01P3/14, G01P15/18, G06F17/14
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG DER AMPLITUDE UND PHASENVERZÖGERUNG EINES SINUSFÖRMIGEN SIGNALS[2019/16]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING THE AMPLITUDE AND PHASE DELAY OF A SINUSOIDAL SIGNAL[2019/16]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR FOURNIR L'AMPLITUDE ET LE RETARD DE PHASE D'UN SIGNAL SINUSOÏDAL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2018National basic fee paid 
04.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
04.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2008022653  (VERIGY PTE LTD SINGAPORE [SG], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0076] * * paragraphs [0086] - [0088] * * paragraphs [00102] - [00109] * * paragraphs [00133] - [00134] * * figures 3, 6, 7 *;
 [A]US2004085096  (WARD PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003174797  (GRUSHIN STANISLAV [US]) [A] 11 * figure 3 *;
 [A]  - Edward Lee ET AL, "Sampling and Reconstruction", Structure and Interpretation of Signals and Systems, ISBN 978-0-201-74551-1, (20030101), pages 373 - 392, URL: https://chess.eecs.berkeley.edu/eecs124/reading/LeeAndVaraiya11.pdf, (20170313), XP055354015 [A] 1 * pages 373-374 * * figure 11.3 *
 [A]  - HILL G, "THE BENEFITS OF UNDERSAMPLING", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, PENTON MEDIA, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (19940711), vol. 42, no. 14, ISSN 0013-4872, XP000459838 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Roberto Micheletti, "Phase Angle Measurement Between Two Sinusoidal Signals", IEEE Trans. Instr. Meas. vol. 40, no. 1, (19910201), pages 40 - 42, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/ielx1/19/2452/00069948.pdf?tp=&arnumber=69948&isnumber=2452, (20170310), XP055353815 [A] 4-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/19.69948
 [A]  - BAPTISTE MARECHAL ET AL, "Direct digital synthesiser (DDS) design parameters optimisation for vibrating MEMS sensors: Optimisation of phase accumulator, Look-Up Table (LUT) and Digital to Analog Converter (DAC) sizes", 2014 SYMPOSIUM ON DESIGN, TEST, INTEGRATION AND PACKAGING OF MEMS/MOEMS (DTIP), CIRCUITS MULTI PROJETS - CMP, doi:10.1109/DTIP.2014.7056692, ISBN 978-2-35500-028-7, (20140401), pages 1 - 5, (20150309), XP032746454 [A] 11,14,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DTIP.2014.7056692
 [A]  - K.R. Rao ET AL, "Discrete Fourier Transform", Digital Video and Audio Broadcasting Technology: A Practical Engineering Guide (3rd edition), (20100101), pages 5 - 40, doi:10.1007/978-1-4020-6629-0_2, ISSN 1860-4862, ISBN 978-3-642-11611-7, XP055354004 [A] 7-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-4020-6629-0_2
by applicantUS5166959
 WO2008022653