EP3548323 - METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR WHEEL TORQUE INTERRUPTION IN THE EVENT OF A CHANGE IN THE BRAKING RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | |||
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANTREL, Cédric 13 rue Jean Pigeon 94220 Charenton Le Pont / FR | 02 /
MARSILIA, Marco 3 allée des Hautes Bruyères 94230 Cachan / FR | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/41] | Rougemont, Bernard Renault s.a.s TCR GRA 2 36 - Sce 00267 1, Avenue du Golf 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17783930.5 | 21.09.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017FR52531 | Priority number, date | FR20160061867 | 02.12.2016 Original published format: FR 1661867 | [2019/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018100258 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548323 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/48, B60W20/00, B60W20/15, B60W30/18, B60W10/184, B60W10/08, B60W10/11, B60W30/19 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
B60K6/48 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60W30/19 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60W20/00 (EP,RU);
B60W20/15 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60W30/18127 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60K2006/4841 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2710/1005 (EP,US);
B60W2710/18 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
B60Y2200/92 (KR);
B60Y2300/18125 (KR);
B60Y2300/19 (KR);
B60Y2300/89 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2400/81 (KR);
Y02T10/62 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION DER RADDREHMOMENTUNTERBRECHUNG BEI EINER ÄNDERUNG DES BREMSVERHÄLTNISSES | [2019/41] | English: | METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR WHEEL TORQUE INTERRUPTION IN THE EVENT OF A CHANGE IN THE BRAKING RATIO | [2019/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMPENSATION DE RUPTURE DE COUPLE A LA ROUE EN CAS DE SITUATION DE CHANGEMENT DE RAPPORT EN FREINAGE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 21.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US6126251 (YOSHII KINYA [JP], et al) [I] 1-9 * column 9, line 37 - column 10, line 39; figures 1,2,7 *; | [I]WO2009080901 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 18; figure 1 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 15 * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 13; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2012156043 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9* page 7, line 23 - page 10, line 3; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | FR2973299 |