Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469013

EP3469013 - AMORPHOUS THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THERMOFORMABLE SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roquette Frères
1 rue de la Haute Loge
62136 Lestrem / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / AMEDRO, Hélène
246 Rue du pont de pierres
62400 BETHUNE / FR
02 / SAINT-LOUP, René
3 Avenue de la République
59160 LOMME / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
31, rue des Poissonceaux
CS 40009
59044 Lille Cedex / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17784335.609.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017FR51470
Priority number, dateFR2016005536810.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655368
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212191
Date:14.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469013
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08G63/672
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:AMORPHES THERMOPLASTISCHES POLYESTER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON THERMOFORMBAREN FOLIEN[2019/16]
English:AMORPHOUS THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THERMOFORMABLE SHEETS[2019/16]
French:POLYESTER THERMOPLASTIQUE AMORPHE POUR LA FABRICATION DE FEUILLES THERMOFORMABLES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2012177854  (LEE ROY [KR], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0006] , [0012] , [0019] , [0020]; example 5; claims 1,7 *
by applicantUS2012177854
 US6025061
 US2011282020
 WO2013062408
 EP1882712
    - YOON et al., "Synthesis and Characteristics of a Biobased High-Tg Terpolyester of Isosorbide, Ethylene Glycol, and 1,4-Cyclohexane Dimethanol: Effect of Ethylene Glycol as a Chain Linker on Polymerization", Macromolecules, (20130000), vol. 46, pages 7219 - 7231