blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3512473

EP3512473 - DEVICE FOR LOCALIZED COOLING OF AN ORGAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.03.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
25 rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Université Grenoble Alpes
621 avenue Centrale
38400 Saint-Martin-d'Hères / FR
For all designated states
Centre Hospitalier Universitaire Grenoble Alpes
Boulevard de la Chantourne
38700 La Tronche / FR
[2019/30]
Inventor(s)01 / AUBERT, Nicolas
53C rue Pierre Sémard-Parme
38000 Grenoble / FR
02 / CHABROL, Claude
3 avenue Pierre Mendes France
38320 Poisat / FR
03 / CHABARDES, Stephan
50 Chemin de la Chappe
38610 Venon / FR
04 / DURAFFOURG, Laurent
32 rue du Louvasset
38500 Voiron / FR
 [2019/30]
Representative(s)INNOV-GROUP
310, avenue Berthelot
69372 Lyon Cedex 08 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/30]GIE Innovation Competence Group
310, avenue Berthelot
69372 Lyon Cedex 08 / FR
Application number, filing date17784341.412.09.2017
[2019/30]
WO2017FR52423
Priority number, dateFR2016005865415.09.2016         Original published format: FR 1658654
[2019/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018051005
Date:22.03.2018
Language:FR
[2018/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3512473
Date:24.07.2019
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3512473
Date:30.09.2020
Language:FR
[2020/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.03.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61F7/00, A61F7/12, H01S3/04
[2019/30]
CPC:
A61F7/007 (EP); A61F7/12 (EP,US); H01S3/005 (US);
A61F2007/0002 (EP,US); A61F2007/0088 (EP,US); A61F2007/0096 (EP,US);
A61F2007/126 (EP,US); F28D2021/005 (US); F28D21/0001 (US);
H01S3/0408 (EP); H01S3/0602 (EP); H01S3/1618 (EP);
H01S3/1653 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÖRTLICH BEGRENZTEN KÜHLUNG EINES ORGANS[2019/30]
English:DEVICE FOR LOCALIZED COOLING OF AN ORGAN[2019/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT LOCALISÉ D'UN ORGANE[2019/30]
Entry into regional phase04.03.2019National basic fee paid 
04.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/30]
04.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.04.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2020Fee for grant paid
07.08.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)01.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.09.2017
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
MK30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU12.09.2017
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2023/30]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/25]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/23]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/10]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/50]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/48]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/37]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/30]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/28]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/25]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/23]AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/21]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/20]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/10]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI30.09.2020
NO30.12.2020
Cited inInternational search[A]US5620571  (BAHNS JOHN T [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 21 *;
 [A]JP2006015064  (KEIO GIJUKU, et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] *;
 [A]US2007005121  (KHANNA ROHIT [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0089] - [0095]; figures 34-54 *;
 [A]US9362712  (SHEIK-BAHAE MANSOOR [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 28 - column 3, line 11; figures 8A-9 *;
 [A]WO2016102351  (COMMISSARIAT À L ÉNERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ÉNERGIES ALTERNATIVES [FR]) [A] 1-10* page 11, line 4 - page 13, line 14; figure 1 *
by applicantUS5620571
 JP2006015064
 US2007005121
 US9362712
 WO2016102351
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.