Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3523287

EP3523287 - BENZO[b]THIOPHENE COMPOUNDS AS STING AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / ALTMAN, Michael, D.
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
02 / CASH, Brandon, D.
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
03 / CHANG, Wonsuk
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US
04 / CUMMING, Jared, N.
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
05 / HAIDLE, Andrew, M.
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
06 / HENDERSON, Timothy, J.
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts02115-5727 / US
07 / JEWELL, James, P.
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
08 / LARSEN, Matthew, A.
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
09 / LIANG, Rui
4 Schindler Court
East Brunswick, New Jersey 08816 / US
10 / LIM, Jongwon
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
11 / LU, Min
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
12 / OTTE, Ryan, D.
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
13 / SIU, Tony
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
14 / TROTTER, Benjamin Wesley
33 Avenue Louis Pasteur
Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US
15 / TYAGARAJAN, Sriram
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Povey, Alexander W.G.
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
European Patents
Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date17784507.002.10.2017
[2019/33]
WO2017US54688
Priority number, dateUS201662404062P04.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662404062 P
[2019/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018067423
Date:12.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3523287
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:C07D333/60, C07D409/12, C07D498/04, A61K31/381, A61K31/385, A61K31/424, A61P35/00
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Extension statesBA06.05.2019
ME06.05.2019
Validation statesMA06.05.2019
MD06.05.2019
TitleGerman:BENZO[B]THIOPHENVERBINDUNGEN ALS STING-AGONISTEN[2019/33]
English:BENZO[b]THIOPHENE COMPOUNDS AS STING AGONISTS[2019/33]
French:COMPOSÉS DE BENZO [b] THIOPHÈNE EN TANT QU'AGONISTES DE PIQÛRE[2019/33]
Entry into regional phase06.05.2019National basic fee paid 
06.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
06.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US4299769  (MCEVOY FRANCIS J, et al) [X] 1,10 * gamma-oxo-benzo[b]thiophene-2-butyric acid; column 14, line 9 - line 10; example 4 * * 3-(benzo[b]thien-2-ylcarbonyl)-2-methylpropionic acid; column 21, line 4 - line 5; example 35 *;
 [X]WO2012068702  (INST MED BIOTECHNOLOGY CAMS [CN], et al) [X] 1,15 * claim 1 * * page 16; compound 3d *;
 [X]US4952571  (REDPATH JAMES [GB], et al) [X] 10-13,15 * column 4, line 40 - line 41 * * column 5, line 59 - line 60 *;
 [A]WO2015077354  (UNIV CHICAGO [US]) [A] 1-27 * claims 1, 5 *
 [X]  - PUSHPARATHINAM GOPINATH ET AL, "As many as six tandem reactions in one step! Unprecedented formation of highly functionalized benzothiophenes", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS - CHEMCOM., (20090101), no. 46, doi:10.1039/b914424b, ISSN 1359-7345, page 7131, XP055425123 [X] 1,10 * scheme 1; page 7131; compound 7f *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b914424b
 [X]  - M K BHATTACHARJEE ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF HETEROCYCLIC STEROIDS-III* AN UNSUCCESSFUL ATTEMPT AT THE SYNTHESIS OF B-NOR-6- THIAEQUILENIN THROUGH 3-CYANO-7-METHOXY4OXO-1,2,3,4- TETRAHYDRODIBENZOTHIOPHENE", TETRAHEDRON, (19600101), vol. 10, pages 215 - 222, XP055425187 [X] 1,10 * page 216; compound VI *
 [X]  - CAGNIANT, "Parsing Failed", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, SOCIETE FRANCAISE DE CHIMIE. PARIS, FRANCE, (19520101), ISSN 0037-8968, page 336, XP009501564 [X] 1,10 * page 336; compound 1a * * last paragarph of right column; page 336 *
by applicantUS7488802
 US7521051
 US8008449
 US8354509
 US8168757
 WO2004004771
 WO2004072286
 WO2004056875
 US2011271358
 WO2013019906
 WO2010077634
 US8383796
 WO2010027827
 WO2011066342
 WO0102369
 WO02068470
 WO0210192
    - S. BERGE et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, no. 1, pages 1 - 19
    - P. GOULD, International J. of Pharmaceutics, (19860000), vol. 33, pages 201 - 217
    - The Orange Book, Food & Drug Administration
    - BRUNO, N. C.; NILJIANSKUL, N.; BUCHWALD, S. L., J. Org. Chem., (20140000), vol. 79, page 4161