Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3446971

EP3446971 - AIRCRAFT TIRE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND AIRCRACT TIRE MANAGEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/09]
Inventor(s)01 / SHOYAMA Yoshinobu
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1
Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/09]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/09]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17785934.517.04.2017
[2019/09]
WO2017JP15415
Priority number, dateJP2016008381119.04.2016         Original published format: JP 2016083811
[2019/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017183596
Date:26.10.2017
Language:JA
[2017/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3446971
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.10.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:B64C25/36, B60C19/00, B60C23/00, B60C23/04, B60C23/20, B60S5/04, B60C23/10
[2019/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/09]
TitleGerman:VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR FLUGZEUGREIFEN UND VERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLUGZEUGREIFEN[2019/09]
English:AIRCRAFT TIRE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND AIRCRACT TIRE MANAGEMENT DEVICE[2019/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE PNEUMATIQUE D'AÉRONEF ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE PNEUMATIQUE D'AÉRONEF[2019/09]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2018Translation filed 
13.11.2018National basic fee paid 
13.11.2018Search fee paid 
13.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/09]
20.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2930037  (GOODRICH CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0025] *;
 [A]WO2015143451  (ELDEC CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US2015224831  (MILLER TRENT DARYL [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] *;
 [A]US2014027571  (BARMICHEV SERGEY [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102015110042  (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0015]; figure all *
International search[A]JP2015526338  (The Boeing Co.) [A] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0058] to [0063]; fig. 9 & US 2014/0027571 A1 paragraphs [0062] to [0067]; fig. 9 & WO 2014/018196 A1 & EP 2838792 A1 & RU 2014144119 A *;
 [A]JPH04189610  (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-2 * , fig. 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2013018483  (MESSIER BUGATTI DOWTY) [A] 1-2 * , paragraph [0021] & US 2013/0015290 A1 paragraph [0027] & EP 2546140 A1 & FR 2977864 A1 & CN 102874404 A & CA 2781750 A1 *
by applicantJP2008049999