Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3446330

EP3446330 - SMALL PITCH DIRECT VIEW DISPLAY AND METHOD OF MAKING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GLO AB
Scheelevägen 22
223 63 Lund / SE
[2019/09]
Inventor(s)01 / DEEMAN, Neil
c/o GLO-USA, Inc.
1255 Bordeaux Avenue
Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US
02 / JANSEN, Michael
c/o GLO-USA, Inc.
1255 Bordeaux Avenue
Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US
03 / LEE, Hyung-Chul
c/o GLO-USA, Inc.
1255 Bordeaux Avenue
Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US
04 / LIU, Kai
c/o GLO-USA, Inc.
1255 Bordeaux Avenue
Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US
05 / OKUI, Kazunori
c/o GLO-USA, Inc.
1255 Bordeaux Avenue
Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US
 [2019/09]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2019/09]
Application number, filing date17786687.821.04.2017
[2019/09]
WO2017US28771
Priority number, dateUS201662326255P22.04.2016         Original published format: US 201662326255 P
[2019/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017184941
Date:26.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3446330
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2017
[2019/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.10.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01L25/075, H01L33/44
[2019/51]
Former International [2019/09]H01L25/075, H01L25/13, H01L25/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/09]
TitleGerman:DIREKTANSICHTSANZEIGE MIT KLEINEM NEIGUNGSWINKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/09]
English:SMALL PITCH DIRECT VIEW DISPLAY AND METHOD OF MAKING THEREOF[2019/09]
French:ÉCRAN À AFFICHAGE DIRECT À PETIT PAS ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2019/09]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2018National basic fee paid 
15.11.2018Search fee paid 
15.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
15.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/09]
06.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2015117273  (CREE HUIZHOU SOLID STATE LIGHTING CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0062] - [0108] *;
 [X]WO2009133870  (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0106] *;
 [X]US2014367633  (BIBL ANDREAS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] - [0141] *;
 [X]WO2014030830  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-15 * page 6, line 7 - page 17, line 16 *
International search[XA]US2016043061  (RHEE BYUNGJOON [KR]) [X] 1-7, 11-17 * See paragraphs [0065]-[0197], claim 14 and figures 8-20. * [A] 8-10, 18-20;
 [A]US2015069429  (RAY WILLIAM JOHNSTONE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0093]-[0101] and figures 20-29. *;
 [A]US2014021493  (ANDREWS PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0099]-[0101] and figures 10A-10E. *;
 [A]WO2016057588  (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0051]-[0052] and figure 6. *;
 [A]KR20150094733  (PIXTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0030] and figure la. *