Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3500621

EP3500621 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ISOCYANATE-BASED FOAM CONSTRUCTION BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.05.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.02.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  31.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - extension statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Firestone Building Products Company, LLC
200 4th Avenue South
Nashville, TN 37201 / US
[2019/26]
Inventor(s)01 / LETTS, John B.
3449 Eden Way Place
Carmel Indiana 46033 / US
02 / YAO, Chunhua
6547 Paddle Drive
Carmel Indiana 46033 / US
03 / HUBBARD, Michael J.
17 River Forest Street
Anderson Indiana 46011 / US
 [2019/26]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/26]
Application number, filing date17787275.121.08.2017
[2019/26]
WO2017US47819
Priority number, dateUS201662377081P19.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662377081 P
[2019/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018035526
Date:22.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3500621
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:C08J9/14, B32B5/20, C08L75/04, C08G18/06
[2019/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/26]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHAUMSTOFFBAUPLATTEN AUF ISOCYANATBASIS[2019/26]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ISOCYANATE-BASED FOAM CONSTRUCTION BOARDS[2019/26]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PANNEAUX DE CONSTRUCTION EN MOUSSE À BASE D'ISOCYANATE[2019/26]
Entry into regional phase18.03.2019National basic fee paid 
18.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/26]
18.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5624969  (SEIFERT HOLGER [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,11-16,19-21 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 4 - line 21 * * column 8, line 25 - line 46 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 31 * * example 9 * [I] 9,10,17,18,22;
 [I]US2003013777  (THORNSBERRY JAMES [US], et al) [I] 1-22 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [IA]US2004087674  (LETTS JOHN B [US]) [I] 1-18,21,22 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * [A] 19,20;
 [I]US2014066532  (COMBS GEORGE G [US], et al) [I] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0014] * * claim - *;
 [I]US2014094530  (COMBS GEORGE G [US], et al) [I] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0014] * * claim - *
by applicantUS5686499
 US5837742
 US5182309
 US2004082676
 US6632509
 US6615892
 US5700538
 US5703154
 US5804661
 US5854327
 US5093206
 US5468550
 US6502360
 US6743864
 US6543199
 US5725711
 US5516829
 US5512118
 US5486249
 US6579921
 US6110846
 US6764733
 US6487830