Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3529344

EP3529344 - CONSUMER PRODUCT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
20.12.2019Change - extension statespublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2019/35]
Inventor(s)01 / LYNCH, Matthew, Lawrence
One P&G Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
02 / ILLIE, Brandon, Philip
One P&G Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
03 / SAWIN, Philip Andrew
One P&G Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
04 / YEARY, Amber, Joy
One P&G Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2019/35]
Representative(s)Fiesser, Gerold Michael
Mathys & Squire
Maximilianstraße 35 Eingang A
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/35]P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date17788078.813.10.2017
[2019/35]
WO2017US56450
Priority number, dateUS201662410034P19.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662410034 P
[2019/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018075338
Date:26.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3529344
Date:28.08.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018
[2019/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/37, C11D3/12, C11D3/00, C11D3/04, C11D7/02, C11D7/10
[2019/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/35]
TitleGerman:VERBRAUCHERPRODUKTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/35]
English:CONSUMER PRODUCT COMPOSITION[2019/35]
French:COMPOSITION DE PRODUIT DE CONSOMMATION[2019/35]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2019National basic fee paid 
18.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/35]
18.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US9347022  (FRENTZEL LISA GRACE [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-21 * columns 7-9; claim -; table - *;
 [A]DE102006034051  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-21 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]US5935917  (FARRELL TERRENCE [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 8, lines 14-18; example -; claim - *
by applicantUSRE34584E
 US5104646
 US5106609
 US2011243874
 US2011243875
 US2011240065
 US2011243878
 US2011243871
 US2011243876
 US2014030206
 WO2014018985
 WO2014018986
 WO2014018987
 WO2014018988
 WO2014018989
 US2009220443
 US5674478
 US5750122
 US4529586
 US4507280
 US4663158
 US4197865
 US4217914
 US4381919
 US4422853
 US7867986