Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3526524

EP3526524 - PANEL MOUNTING BRACKET WITH GROUNDING MID-CLAMP AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  04.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
13.12.2019Change - extension statespublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stapleton, Kevin
535 Shady Hollow
New Braunsfels, Texas 78132 / US
[2019/34]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/34]
Representative(s)Sach, Greg Robert
Sach & Associates
Siedlungsstrasse 4a
85253 Erdweg / DE
[2019/34]
Application number, filing date17788415.211.10.2017
[2019/34]
WO2017US56055
Priority number, dateUS201662406527P11.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662406527 P
US20171572912510.10.2017         Original published format: US201715729125
[2019/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018071482
Date:19.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3526524
Date:21.08.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018
[2019/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:F24S20/70
[2019/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/34]
TitleGerman:PANEELBEFESTIGUNGSKLAMMER MIT ERDUNGSMITTELKLEMME UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN[2019/34]
English:PANEL MOUNTING BRACKET WITH GROUNDING MID-CLAMP AND RELATED METHODS[2019/34]
French:SUPPORT DE MONTAGE DE PANNEAUX À BRIDE CENTRALE DE MISE À LA TERRE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2019/34]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2019National basic fee paid 
10.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/34]
10.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2012234378  (WEST JOHN RAYMOND [US], et al) [X] 11 * figures 29, 30, 31 * * paragraph [0152] * * paragraph [0157] * * paragraph [0159] * * paragraph [0175] * [Y] 8,9 [I] 1-7,10,12-20;
 [Y]US2015113889  (STAPLETON KEVIN [US]) [Y] 8,9 * figure - * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0024] *;
 [A]WO2012116223  (HADDOCK ROBERT M M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]US2011214365  (AFTANAS JEFFREY M [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]US2015171785  (DICKEY DON [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *
by applicantUS9628018
 US9484853
 US9397605
 US9145685
 US9057545