Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3448892

EP3448892 - HUMANIZED ANTI-BASIGIN ANTIBODIES AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fourth Military Medical University
No.169 West Changle Road
Xi'an, Shaanxi 710032 / CN
[2019/10]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Zhinan
No.169 West Changle Road
Xi'an Shaanxi 710032 / CN
02 / ZHU, Ping
No.169 West Changle Road
Xi'an Shaanxi 710032 / CN
03 / HUANG, Wan
No.169 West Changle Road
Xi'an Shaanxi 710032 / CN
04 / ZHANG, Zheng
No.169 West Changle Road
Xi'an Shaanxi 710032 / CN
05 / ZHANG, Yang
No.169 West Changle Road
Xi'an Shaanxi 710032 / CN
06 / ZHANG, Mengyao
No.169 West Changle Road
Xi'an Shaanxi 710032 / CN
07 / BIAN, Huijie
No.169 West Changle Road
Xi'an Shaanxi 710032 / CN
08 / JIANG, Jianli
No.169 West Changle Road
Xi'an Shaanxi 710032 / CN
 [2019/10]
Representative(s)Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/10]Briscoe, Paul Brian , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Application number, filing date17788834.402.05.2017
[2019/10]
WO2017CN82713
Priority number, dateCN20161028513929.04.2016         Original published format: CN201610285139
[2019/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017186182
Date:02.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3448892
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN02.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/42, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P33/06
[2019/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/10]
Extension statesBA29.10.2018
ME29.10.2018
Validation statesMA29.10.2018
MD29.10.2018
TitleGerman:HUMANISIERTE ANTI-BASIGIN-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2019/10]
English:HUMANIZED ANTI-BASIGIN ANTIBODIES AND THE USE THEREOF[2019/10]
French:ANTICORPS HUMANISÉS ANTI-BASIGINE ET LEUR UTILISATION[2019/10]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2018National basic fee paid 
29.10.2018Search fee paid 
29.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
29.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/10]
12.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]CN101054416  (CHEN ZHINAN [CN]) [X] 1,8-13 * abstract * * paragraph [[0001]] - paragraph [[0016]] * * paragraph [[0029]] - paragraph [[0036]] * * paragraph [[0050]] - paragraph [[0051]] * [A] 3,4,14 [I] 2,5-7;
 [I]AU2015213308  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [I] 3,4 * abstract *
International search[PX]CN105820250  (4TH MILITARY MEDICAL UNIV CHINESE PLA) [PX] 1-30 * description, paragraghs 15-33 *;
 [A]CN104086654  (FOURTH MILITARY MEDICAL UNIV) [A] 1-30 * the abstract, description, paragraghs 36, 65-66, 80-86 *;
 [A]CN101550416  (ZHINAN CHEN [CN]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document pages 1035-1044 *;
 [A]  - YANG, B., "Molecular Modeling and Docking of HAbl8G/ CD 147 with Its Monoclonal Antibody and Antibody Humanization Design", MASTER THESIS, (20080415), pages 1 - 83, XP009515631 [A] 1-30 * , article E059-63 *
 [A]  - Zhu Hongbin, "Preparation of anti-HAbl8G/ CD 147 antibody fragment (HAbl8-huScFv)2-Fc and characterization of in vitro anti-tumor effec t", MASTER THESIS, (20091215), pages 1 - 87, XP009515633 [A] 1-30 * , article E059-43 *
 [A]  - YE, H., "Preparation and functional characterization of anti-human monoclonal antibody against recombinant extracellular domain of HAb18G/ CD 147", DOCTORAL MASTER THESIS, (20051015), pages 1 - 110, XP009515634 [A] 1-30 * , article E072-236 *