Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3449719

EP3449719 - HEALTH CONDITION ESTIMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 07.08.2019 [2019/32]
05.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 07.08.2019 [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Osaka University
1-1 Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
[2019/10]
Inventor(s)01 / YAGI, Yasushi
c/o Osaka University
1-1 Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
02 / OKURA, Fumio
c/o Osaka University
1-1 Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
03 / MAKIHARA, Yasushi
c/o Osaka University
1-1 Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
04 / MURAMATSU, Daigo
c/o Osaka University
1-1 Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
 [2019/10]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2019/10]
Application number, filing date17789008.413.02.2017
[2019/10]
WO2017JP05089
Priority number, dateJP2016009068028.04.2016         Original published format: JP 2016090680
[2019/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017187719
Date:02.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3449719
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A01K29/00, A61B5/107, A61B5/11
[2019/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/10]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSCHÄTZUNG DES GESUNDHEITSZUSTANDES[2019/10]
English:HEALTH CONDITION ESTIMATION DEVICE[2019/10]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ESTIMATION D'UN ÉTAT DE SANTÉ[2019/10]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2018Translation filed 
12.11.2018National basic fee paid 
12.11.2018Search fee paid 
12.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
19.06.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2006218122  (NEW IND RES ORGANIZATION) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1 to 14 (Family: none) *
 [XA]  - S.VIAZZI, "Comparison of a three-dimensional and two-dimensional camera system for automated measurement of back posture in dairy cows", Computers and Electronics in Agriculture, (20140100), vol. 100, pages 139 - 147, XP055438233 [X] 1, 7, 8, 14, 15 [A] 2-6, 9-13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compag.2013.11.005
 [A]  - TAMAKI KIDA, "A Technique for Measuring Grazing Cattle Form Using a 3D Digital Camera", Journal of Japanese Society of Grassland Science, (20140000), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 85 - 90, XP055438435 [A] 1-15
 [A]  - T.VAN HERTEM, "Comparison of segmentation algorithms for cow contour extraction from natural barn background in side view images", Computers and Electronics in Agriculture, (20130200), vol. 91, pages 65 - 74, XP055438436 [A] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compag.2012.12.003