Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3450215

EP3450215 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.11.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.02.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/10]
Inventor(s)01 / ISHIKAWA Satoshi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / KAWAKITA Akihiro
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/10]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/10]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17789247.811.04.2017
[2019/10]
WO2017JP14789
Priority number, dateJP2016009132128.04.2016         Original published format: JP 2016091321
JP2016009132628.04.2016         Original published format: JP 2016091326
[2019/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017187960
Date:02.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3450215
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/13, B60C11/03, B60C11/12
[2019/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/10]
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2019/10]
English:TIRE[2019/10]
French:PNEUMATIQUE[2019/10]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018Translation filed 
27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Search fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/10]
07.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0841199  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, lines 42-57; figure -; claim - *;
 [XA]JP2012040888  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-8;
 [X]JP2003063212  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1 * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]DE102010016978  (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]JPH11139114  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1,4 *
International search[XA]JPH11139114  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1 * , claim 1; paragraph [0011]; fig. 1, 4 (Family: none) * [A] 2-8;
 [A]JP2003063212  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8 * , claim 2; fig. 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2002029221  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8 * , paragraph [0021]; fig. 2 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2016055817  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [A] 1-8 * , claim 1; fig. 3 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012035686  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8 * , paragraph [0025]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012076684  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8 * , claim 1; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007062691  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , claim 1; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2006213175  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8 * , claim 1; fig. 1 & US 2008/0041509 A1 claim 1; fig. 1 & EP 1867496 A1 & CN 101111398 A *;
 [A]EP2322359  (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings & DE 102009044552 A *