Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3435327

EP3435327 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING ROAD SURFACE STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.12.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 30.01.2019  [2019/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KYB Corporation
World Trade Center Building
4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6111 / JP
[2019/05]
Inventor(s)01 / HASEBE, Atsutoshi
c/o KYB CORPORATION
World Trade Center Bldg.
4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6111 / JP
 [2019/05]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2019/05]
Application number, filing date17789441.721.04.2017
[2019/05]
WO2017JP16088
Priority number, dateJP2016008897927.04.2016         Original published format: JP 2016088979
[2019/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017188158
Date:02.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3435327
Date:30.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/00, B60R21/00, G01B11/02, G06T1/00, G06T7/593, G08G1/00, H04N7/18
[2019/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DES ZUSTANDES EINER STRASSENOBERFLÄCHE[2019/05]
English:DEVICE FOR DETECTING ROAD SURFACE STATE[2019/05]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE L'ÉTAT DE LA SURFACE D'UNE ROUTE[2019/05]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2018Translation filed 
25.10.2018National basic fee paid 
25.10.2018Search fee paid 
25.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
25.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/05]
30.01.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/11]
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2014089548  (SHARP KK) [Y] 3 * , paragraphs [0041] to [0042] & WO 2014/064990 A1 *;
 [A]JP2004240480  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0032] to [0084]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *
 [XY]  - MORITO SHIOHARA et al., "Real-times Stereoscopic Rangefinding Between Vehicles", IEICE Technical Report IE 96-47 to 56 Gazo Kogaku, (19960927), vol. 96, no. 280, pages 13 - 18 [X] 1-2 [Y] 3