blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3435327 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3435327



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 118
13.02.2019 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
13.02.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.02.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.02.2019 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.11.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
16.11.2018 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
15.11.2018 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
12.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.11.2018 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
25.10.2018 Description Search / examination 21
25.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 11
25.10.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.09.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
20.11.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
02.11.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
02.11.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
02.11.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 24