Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3485433

EP3485433 - GENERATING VIDEO FRAMES USING NEURAL NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deepmind Technologies Limited
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
[2019/21]
Inventor(s)01 / KALCHBRENNER, Nal Emmerich
7 Pancras Square
Kings Cross London N1C 4AG / GB
02 / VAN DEN OORD, Aaron Gerard Antonius
7 Pancras Square
Kings Cross London N1C 4AG / GB
03 / SIMONYAN, Karen
6 Pancras Square
London N1C 4AG / GB
 [2019/21]
Representative(s)Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park
Heatley Road
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[2019/21]
Application number, filing date17790889.429.09.2017
[2019/21]
WO2017US54528
Priority number, dateUS201662402914P30.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662402914 P
[2019/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018064591
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3485433
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018
[2019/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06N3/04
[2019/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG VON VIDEOBILDERN MIT NEURONALEN NETZWERKEN[2019/21]
English:GENERATING VIDEO FRAMES USING NEURAL NETWORKS[2019/21]
French:GÉNÉRATION DE TRAMES VIDÉO À L'AIDE DE RÉSEAUX NEURONAUX[2019/21]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2018National basic fee paid 
31.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/21]
31.08.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]  - Junhyuk Oh ET AL, "Action-Conditional Video Prediction using Deep Networks in Atari Games", (20151222), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1507.08750.pdf, (20171213), XP055434759 [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line l *
 [Y]  - Aäron van den Oord et al., "Pixel Recurrent Neural Networks", (20160125), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1601.06759.pdf, (20170906), XP055404359 [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1, column l, line 1 - page 6, column l, line l *
 [A]  - HE KAIMING ET AL, Identity Mappings in Deep Residual Networks, NETWORK AND PARALLEL COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CHAM, PAGE(S) 630 - 645, (20160917), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-540-28012-5, XP047355424 [A] 5,8,15,18 * abstract * * page 631, line 17 - page 638, line 18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-46493-0_38
 [XP]  - Nal Kalchbrenner ET AL, "Video Pixel Networks", (20161003), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1610.00527.pdf, (20171214), XP055427937 [XP] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 8, line 37 *