Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3533082

EP3533082 - METHOD FOR FORMING A THIN-FILM TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[2019/36]
Inventor(s)01 / NELSON, Shelby, Forrester
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650 / US
02 / ELLINGER, Carolyn, Rae
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650 / US
 [2019/36]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[2019/36]
Application number, filing date17792253.117.10.2017
[2019/36]
WO2017US56856
Priority number, dateUS20161533857631.10.2016         Original published format: US201615338576
[2019/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018080831
Date:03.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3533082
Date:04.09.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018
[2019/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/768, H01L21/285, H01L21/3065, H01L29/40, H01L29/417, H01L29/423, H01L29/66
[2019/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DÜNNSCHICHTTRANSISTORS[2019/36]
English:METHOD FOR FORMING A THIN-FILM TRANSISTOR[2019/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN TRANSISTOR À COUCHES MINCES[2019/36]
Entry into regional phase23.04.2019National basic fee paid 
23.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/36]
23.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2016076146  (ELLINGER CAROLYN RAE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2014065831  (ELLINGER CAROLYN R [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2014065838  (ELLINGER CAROLYN R [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7571529
 US2010301337
 US7413982
 US7456429
 US7789961
 US2009130858