Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3507998

EP3507998 - SECURE MESSAGING SESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/28]
Inventor(s)01 / LAKIN, Derek
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/28]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/28]
Application number, filing date17793779.418.10.2017
[2019/28]
WO2017US57062
Priority number, dateGB2016001774420.10.2016         Original published format: GB 201617744
US20171540181109.01.2017         Original published format: US201715401811
[2019/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018075571
Date:26.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3507998
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018
[2019/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W12/08, H04L29/06, G06F21/62, H04W12/04
[2019/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SICHERE NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNGSSITZUNG[2019/28]
English:SECURE MESSAGING SESSION[2019/28]
French:SESSION DE MESSAGERIE SÉCURISÉE[2019/28]
Entry into regional phase04.04.2019National basic fee paid 
04.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/28]
04.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2016037345  (MARGADOUDAKIS ZACHARY [US]) [X] 1-3,8-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0067] - [0068] - [0125] - [0126] - [0132] - [0133] - [0149] , [0218]; figure 1 * [I] 4-7;
 [XI]US2015347010  (YANG LAWRENCE Y [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,9-14 * paragraphs [0077] , [ 216] , [ 236] , [ 239] , [ 261] , [ 264] - [0265]; figures 4D,5B,5D,5K-5N * [I] 4-8,15;
 [I]US2016048705  (YANG LAWRENCE Y [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0011] - [0 62] , [ 219] , [ 224] , [ 234] , [ 240] , [ 247]; figures 7E, 9A-9B, 10B *;
 [I]US2011225426  (AGARWAL AMIT [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0005] - [0 30] , [0 37] - [0038] - [0 45] - [0046]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2014191040  (PHONAK AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 21 - page 5, line 3; abstract *