Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3526256

EP3526256 - ANTI-LAG-3 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agenus Inc.
3 Forbes Road
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
[2019/34]
Inventor(s)01 / WILSON, Nicholas Stuart
292 Grove Street
Medford Massachusetts 02155 / US
02 / SAVITSKY, David Adam
28 Sunrise Road
Boxford MA 01921 / US
03 / JENNINGS, Shawn Michael
27 Elm Street
Acton MA 01720 / US
04 / VAN DIJK, Marc
Tolhuislaan 8A
3735 KG Bosch en Duin / NL
05 / MUNDT, Cornelia Anne
Hangstrasse 34
79539 Lörrach / DE
 [2019/34]
Representative(s)Lahrtz, Fritz
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Prinzregentenstraße 68
81675 München / DE
[2019/34]
Application number, filing date17794131.711.10.2017
[2019/34]
WO2017US56078
Priority number, dateUS201662406766P11.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662406766 P
US201662420280P10.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662420280 P
[2019/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018071500
Date:19.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3526256
Date:21.08.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018
[2019/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/28
[2019/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/34]
Extension statesBA09.05.2019
ME09.05.2019
Validation statesMA09.05.2019
MD09.05.2019
TitleGerman:ANTI-LAG-3-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/34]
English:ANTI-LAG-3 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF[2019/34]
French:ANTICORPS ANTI-LAG-3 ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION[2019/34]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2019National basic fee paid 
09.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/34]
09.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2010019570  (MEDAREX INC [US], et al) [X] 68,69 * Abstract; examples; claims. * [I] 1-147;
 [XI]WO2016028672  (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [X] 68,69 * Abstract; examples, claims. * [I] 1-147
 [XI]  - S.-R. WOO ET AL, "Immune Inhibitory Molecules LAG-3 and PD-1 Synergistically Regulate T-cell Function to Promote Tumoral Immune Escape", CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20120215), vol. 72, no. 4, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-1620, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 917 - 927, XP055431013 [X] 68,69 * Abstract; anti-LAG-3 antibody 4-10-C9 * [I] 1-147

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-1620
by applicantWO2016073770
 US2004014194
 US2008139407
 US2007099240
 US7972993
 US7709226
 US5677425
 WO02060919
 WO9823289
 WO9734631
 US5869046
 US6121022
 US6277375
 US6165745
 US7658921
 US6737056
 US5624821
 US5648260
 US5585097
 US8591886
 WO2014108483
 US6194551
 WO9429351
 WO0042072
 US4044126
 US4414209
 US4364923
 US6267983
 US6261595
 US6256533
 US6167301
 US6024975
 US6010715
 US5985317
 US5983134
 US5948433
 US5860957
 US6316652
 US6274552
 US6271359
 US6253872
 US6139865
 US6131570
 US6120751
 US6071495
 US6060082
 US6048736
 US6039975
 US6004534
 US5985307
 US5972366
 US5900252
 US5840674
 US5759542
 US5709874
 US6808710
 US7332582
 US7488802
 US8008449
 US8114845
 US8168757
 US8354509
 US8686119
 US8735553
 US8747847
 US8779105
 US8927697
 US8993731
 US9102727
 US9205148
 US2013202623
 US2013291136
 US2014044738
 US2014356363
 US2016075783
 WO2013033091
 WO2015036394
 WO2014179664
 WO2014209804
 WO2014206107
 WO2015058573
 WO2015085847
 WO2015200119
 WO2016015685
 WO2016020856
 US7943743
 US8168179
 US8217149
 US8552154
 US8779108
 US8981063
 US9175082
 US2010203056
 US2003232323
 US2013323249
 US2014341917
 US2015203580
 US2015225483
 US2015346208
 US2015355184
 WO2014100079
 WO2014022758
 WO2014055897
 WO2015061668
 WO2015109124
 WO2015195163
 WO2016000619
 WO2016030350
 US6984720
 US7411057
 US7034121
 US8697845
 US2009123477
 US2014105914
 US2013267688
 US2016145355
 WO2014207064
 WO2016015675
 WO2010005958
 US6391306
 US6383492
 US6403095
 US6410026
 US6436404
 US6447780
 US6447781
 US6610659
 US6645495
 US7029678
 US7858589
 US9074000
 US2009304679
 US2014134191
 US5965726
 US6174666
 US6291664
 US6414132
 US6794498
 US2005048549
 WO8605807
 WO8901036
 US5122464
 US5807715
 WO9002809
 WO9110737
 WO9201047
 WO9218619
 WO9311236
 WO9515982
 WO9520401
 WO9713844
 US5698426
 US5223409
 US5403484
 US5580717
 US5427908
 US5750753
 US5821047
 US5571698
 US5516637
 US5780225
 US5658727
 US5733743
 US5969108
 WO9222324
 US4816567
 US4816397
 US6331415
 EP0239400
 WO9109967
 US5225539
 US5530101
 US5585089
 EP0592106
 EP0519596
 US5565332
 US6407213
 US5766886
 WO9317105
 US2005042664
 US7951917
 US7183076
 US8227577
 US5837242
 US5989830
 US5869620
 US6132992
 US8586713
 US6005079
 WO9404678
 WO9425591
 WO0144301
 WO9824893
 WO9634096
 WO9633735
 US5413923
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5569825
 US5661016
 US5545806
 US5814318
 US5939598
 US6075181
 US6150184
 US4444887
 US4716111
 US5885793
 WO9846645
 WO9850433
 WO9816654
 WO9110741
    - TRIEBEL et al., J Exp Med, (19900000), vol. 171, pages 1393 - 1405
    - WORKMAN et al., J Immunol, (20020000), vol. 169, pages 5392 - 5395
    - HUANG et al., Immunity, (20040000), vol. 21, pages 503 - 513
    - WORKMAN et al., J Immunol, (20090000), vol. 182, pages 1885 - 1891
    - KISIELOW et al., Eur J Immunol, (20050000), vol. 35, pages 2081 - 2088
    - BAIXERAS et al., J Exp Med, (19920000), vol. 176, pages 327 - 337
    - WORKMAN et al., Eur J Immunol, (20020000), vol. 32, pages 2255 - 2263
    - PARK et al., Cell Immunol, (20120000), vol. 278, pages 76 - 83
    - GAGLIANI et al., Nat Med, (20130000), vol. 19, pages 739 - 746
    - BLACKBURN et al., Nat Immunol, (20090000), vol. 10, pages 29 - 37
    - ROCHE; FURUTA, Nat Rev Immunol, (20150000), vol. 15, pages 203 - 216
    - MACON-LEMAITRE; TRIEBEL, Immunology, (20050000), vol. 115, pages 170 - 178
    - HUARD et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 5744 - 5749
    - OKAZAKI et al., J Exp Med, (20110000), vol. 208, pages 395 - 407
    - WOO et al., Cancer Res, (20120000), vol. 72, pages 917 - 927
    - KABAT et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19770000), vol. 252, pages 6609 - 6616
    - CHOTHIA et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - MACCALLUM et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19960000), vol. 262, pages 732 - 745
    - "Protein Sequence and Structure Analysis of Antibody Variable Domains", MARTIN A., Antibody Engineering, Springer-Verlag, (20010000), pages 422 - 439
    - EDELMAN, G.M. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad., (19690000), vol. 63, pages 78 - 85
    - GIEGE R et al., Acta Crystallogr D Biol Crystallogr, (19940000), vol. 50, pages 339 - 350
    - MCPHERSON A, Eur J Biochem, (19900000), vol. 189, pages 1 - 23
    - CHAYEN NE, Structure, (19970000), vol. 5, pages 1269 - 1274
    - MCPHERSON A, J Biol Chem, (19760000), vol. 251, pages 6300 - 6303
    - Meth Enzymol, (19850000), vol. 114-115
    - BRICOGNE G, Acta Crystallogr D Biol Crystallogr, (19930000), vol. 49, pages 37 - 60
    - BRICOGNE G, Meth Enzymol, (19970000), vol. 276A, pages 361 - 423
    - ROVERSI P et al., Acta Crystallogr D Biol Crystallogr, (20000000), vol. 56, pages 1316 - 1323
    - CHAMPE M et al., J Biol Chem, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 1388 - 1394
    - CUNNINGHAM BC; WELLS JA, Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085
    - KARLIN S; ALTSCHUL SF, PNAS, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268
    - KARLIN S; ALTSCHUL SF, PNAS, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877
    - ALTSCHUL SF et al., J Mol Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, page 403
    - ALTSCHUL SF et al., Nuc Acids Res, (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - MYERS; MILLER, CABIOS, (19880000), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17
    - CHOTHIA C; LESK AM, J Mol Biol, (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - AL-LAZIKANI B et al., J Mol Biol, (19970000), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948
    - CHOTHIA C et al., J Mol Biol, (19920000), vol. 227, pages 799 - 817
    - TRAMONTANO A et al., J Mol Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, no. 1, pages 175 - 82
    - LEFRANC M-P, The Immunologist, (19990000), vol. 7, pages 132 - 136
    - LEFRANC M-P, Nucleic Acids Res, (19990000), vol. 27, pages 209 - 212
    - MACCALLUM RM et al., J Mol Biol, (19960000), vol. 262, pages 732 - 745
    - STAHLI C et al., Methods Enzymol, (19830000), vol. 9, pages 242 - 253
    - KIRKLAND TN et al., J Immunol, (19860000), vol. 137, pages 3614 - 9
    - MOREL GA et al., Mol Immunol, (19880000), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 7 - 15
    - MOLDENHAUER G et al., Scand J Immunol, (19900000), vol. 32, pages 77 - 82
    - WAGENER C et al., J Immunol, (19830000), vol. 130, pages 2308 - 2315
    - WAGENER C et al., J Immunol Methods, (19840000), vol. 68, pages 269 - 274
    - KUROKI M et al., Cancer Res, (19900000), vol. 50, pages 4872 - 4879
    - KUROKI M et al., Immunol Invest, (19920000), vol. 21, pages 523 - 538
    - KUROKI M et al., Hybridoma, (19920000), vol. 11, pages 391 - 407
    - Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, pages 386 - 389
    - DALL'ACQUA WF et al., J Biol Chem, (20060000), vol. 281, pages 23514 - 23524
    - SMITH P et al., PNAS, (20120000), vol. 109, pages 6181 - 6186
    - SHIELDS RL et al., J Biol Chem, (20010000), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604
    - DWORNICZAK; MIRAULT, Nucleic Acids Res., (19870000), vol. 15, pages 5181 - 5197
    - HUNT; MORIMOTO, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19850000), vol. 82, no. 19, pages 6455 - 6459
    - KUTMEIER G et al., BioTechniques, (19940000), vol. 17, pages 242 - 246
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, Green Publishing Associates, Inc. and John Wiley & Sons, Inc., (19890000), vol. I, pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6
    - FOECKING MK; HOFSTETTER H, Gene, (19860000), vol. 45, pages 101 - 105
    - COCKETT MI et al., Biotechnology, (19900000), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 662 - 667
    - RUETHER U; MUELLER-HILL B, EMBO J, (19830000), vol. 2, pages 1791 - 1794
    - INOUYE S; INOUYE M, Nuc Acids Res, (19850000), vol. 13, pages 3101 - 3109
    - VAN HEEKE G; SCHUSTER SM, J Biol Chem, (19890000), vol. 24, pages 5503 - 5509
    - LOGAN J; SHENK T, PNAS, (19840000), vol. 81, no. 12, pages 3655 - 3659
    - BITTER G et al., Methods Enzymol., (19870000), vol. 153, pages 516 - 544
    - WIGLER M et al., Cell, (19770000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 223 - 232
    - SZYBALSKA EH; SZYBALSKI W, PNAS, (19620000), vol. 48, no. 12, pages 2026 - 2034
    - LOWY I et al., Cell, (19800000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 817 - 823
    - WIGLER M, PNAS, (19800000), vol. 77, no. 6, pages 3567 - 3570
    - O'HARE K, PNAS, (19810000), vol. 78, pages 1527 - 1531
    - MULLIGAN RC; BERG P, PNAS, (19810000), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 2072 - 2076
    - WU GY; WU CH, Biotherapy, (19910000), vol. 3, pages 87 - 95
    - TOLSTOSHEV P, Ann Rev Pharmacol Toxicol, (19930000), vol. 32, pages 573 - 596
    - MULLIGAN RC, Science, (19930000), vol. 260, pages 926 - 932
    - MORGAN RA; ANDERSON WF, Ann Rev Biochem, (19930000), vol. 62, pages 191 - 217
    - NABEL GJ; FELGNER PL, Trends Biotechnol, (19930000), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 211 - 215
    - SANTERRE RF et al., Gene, (19840000), vol. 30, no. 1-3, pages 147 - 156
    - COLBERE-GARAPIN F et al., J Mol Biol, (19810000), vol. 150, pages 1 - 14
    - "The use of vectors based on gene amplification for the expression of cloned genes in mammalian cells", BEBBINGTON CR; HENTSCHEL CCG, DNA cloning, Academic Press, (19870000), vol. 3
    - CROUSE GF et al., Mol Cell Biol, (19830000), vol. 3, pages 257 - 266
    - PROUDFOOT NJ, Nature, (19860000), vol. 322, pages 562 - 565
    - KOHLER G, PNAS, (19800000), vol. 77, pages 2197 - 2199
    - HAMMERLING GJ et al., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, Elsevier, (19810000), vol. 563, page 681
    - KOHLER G; MILSTEIN C, Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495
    - Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, Academic Press, (19860000), pages 59 - 103
    - KILPATRICK KE et al., Hybridoma, (19970000), vol. 16, pages 381 - 389
    - KOZBOR D, J Immunol, (19840000), vol. 133, pages 3001 - 3005
    - BRODEUR et al., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19870000), pages 51 - 63
    - Goding JW, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, Academic Press
    - BRINKMAN U et al., J Immunol Methods, (19950000), vol. 182, pages 41 - 50
    - AMES RS et al., J Immunol Methods, (19950000), vol. 184, pages 177 - 186
    - KETTLEBOROUGH CA et al., Eur J Immunol, (19940000), vol. 24, pages 952 - 958
    - PERSIC L et al., Gene, (19970000), vol. 187, pages 9 - 18
    - BURTON DR; BARBAS CF, Advan Immunol, (19940000), vol. 57, pages 191 - 280
    - MULLINAX RL et al., BioTechniques, (19920000), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 864 - 869
    - SAWAI H et al., Am J Reprod Immunol, (19950000), vol. 34, pages 26 - 34
    - BETTER M et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043
    - MORRISON SL, Science, (19850000), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207
    - OI VT; MORRISON SL, BioTechniques, (19860000), vol. 4, pages 214 - 221
    - GILLIES SD et al., J Immunol Methods, (19890000), vol. 125, pages 191 - 202
    - PADLAN EA, Mol Immunol, (19910000), vol. 28, no. 4/5, pages 489 - 498
    - STUDNICKA GM et al., Prot Engineering, (19940000), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814
    - ROGUSKA MA et al., PNAS, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973
    - TAN P et al., J Immunol, (20020000), vol. 169, pages 1119 - 1125
    - CALDAS C et al., Protein Eng., (20000000), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 353 - 360
    - MOREA V et al., Methods, (20000000), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 267 - 279
    - BACA M et al., J Biol Chem, (19970000), vol. 272, no. 16, pages 10678 - 10684
    - ROGUSKA MA et al., Protein Eng, (19960000), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 895 - 904
    - COUTO JR et al., Cancer Res., (19950000), vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5973s - 5977s
    - COUTO JR et al., Cancer Res, (19950000), vol. 55, no. 8, pages 1717 - 1722
    - SANDHU JS, Gene, (19940000), vol. 150, no. 2, pages 409 - 410
    - PEDERSEN JT et al., J Mol Biol, (19940000), vol. 235, no. 3, pages 959 - 973
    - RIECHMANN L; MUYLDERMANS S, J Immunol, (19990000), vol. 231, pages 25 - 38
    - NUTTALL SD et al., Curr Pharm Biotechnol, (20000000), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 253 - 263
    - MUYLDERMANS S, J Biotechnol, (20010000), vol. 74, no. 4, pages 277 - 302
    - GREENSPAN NS; BONA CA, FASEB J, (19890000), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 437 - 444
    - NISSINOFF A, J Immunol, (19910000), vol. 147, no. 8, pages 2429 - 2438
    - LONBERG N; HUSZAR D, Int Rev Immunol, (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93
    - SHINMOTO H et al., Cytotechnology, (20040000), vol. 46, pages 19 - 23
    - NAGANAWA Y et al., Human Antibodies, (20050000), vol. 14, pages 27 - 31
    - LEFRANC MP et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (19990000), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 209 - 212
    - RUIZ M et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (20000000), vol. 28, no. 1, pages 219 - 221
    - LEFRANC MP, Nucleic Acids Res, (20010000), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 207 - 209
    - LEFRANC MP, Nucleic Acids Res, (20030000), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 307 - 310
    - LEFRANC MP et al., Dev Compo Immunol, (20050000), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 185 - 203
    - KAAS Q et al., Briefings in Functional Genomics & Proteomics, (20070000), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 253 - 264
    - RETTER I et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (20050000), vol. 33, pages D671 - D674
    - JOHNSON G et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (20000000), vol. 28, pages 214 - 218
    - HALL, T.A., "BioEdit: a user-friendly biological sequence alignment editor and analysis program for Windows 95/98/NT", Nucl. Acids. Symp. Ser., (19990000), vol. 41, pages 95 - 98
    - J. Am. Soc. Mass Spectrom., (20120000), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1512 - 1521
 WO1991GB01134