Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: WO2018036653


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
11.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.2019 Amendment by applicant
07.02.2019 Change - representative
07.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
23.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
03.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication