Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2018036653

WO2018036653 - DEVICE AND METHOD TO PRODUCE INSTANT HOT WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019PCT data prior to European publication 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innosteam Swiss SA
Chemin des Loveresses 5
1523 Granges-Près-Marnand / CH
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / MANTEGAZZI, Florian
Chemin des Loveresse 5
1523 Granges-Près-Marnand / CH
[N/P]
Representative(s)Helbig, Christian
Wagner + Helbig Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date17794225.723.08.2017
WO2017EP01004
Priority number, dateEP2016000185224.08.2016         Original published format: EP 16001852
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018036653
Date:01.03.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:F24H1/12, F24H9/20, A47J31/54
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SOFORTIGEN HERSTELLUNG VON WARMWASSER
English:DEVICE AND METHOD TO PRODUCE INSTANT HOT WATER
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DE L'EAU CHAUDE INSTANTANÉE
Entry into regional phase06.02.2019National basic fee paid 
06.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2008041231  (BEHARRY CHRISTOPHER RANDALL [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,7-10,13,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0029] , [0034] - [0037] - [0043] - [0052] - [0060] - [0073]; figures 1-12 * [I] 2,5,6,11,12,15-19;
 [XI]US2006096465  (HU RUGUO [US] ET AL) [X] 1,8,9,20,21 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0027] , [0031] - [0035]; figures 1-2C * [I] 5-7,10-12;
 [A]WO2014195842  (HEATEX LTD [CN]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010221394  (GAULARD HERVE [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *