Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3459761

EP3459761 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/13]
Inventor(s)01 / KON, Seiji
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / KOUNO, Yoshihide
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/13]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/13]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17799485.218.05.2017
[2019/13]
WO2017JP18748
Priority number, dateJP2016010185820.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016101858
[2019/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017200061
Date:23.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3459761
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C5/01, B60C9/20, B60C13/00, B60C5/00, B60C9/18
[2019/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/13]
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2019/13]
English:TIRE[2019/13]
French:PNEU[2019/13]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018Translation filed 
12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Search fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/13]
24.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP0106778  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 4, lines 20-32; figures 1-8; claims 1-16 * * page 9, line 22 - page 11, line 12 * [Y] 7 [I] 4;
 [XYI]EP0091391  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 11, lines 11-15; figures 1-5; claims 1-16 * * page 8, lines 1-16 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 4;
 [XY]DE2836109  (PHOENIX AG) [X] 1-4 * page 5; figures 1,2; claims 1-5 * [Y] 5-7;
 [XY]WO2016017556  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-8 * [Y] 7;
 EP3176003  [ ] (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] , [0042] , [0043] , [0060]; figures 1-8; claims 1-10 *;
 [XY]EP3020572  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0019] , [0024] , [0025] , [0036]; figures 1-5; claims 1-5 * [Y] 5-7;
 [Y]WO2013077201  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraph [0002]; figures 1-13 *;
 [Y]US2005092416  (TAKAGI SHIGEMASA [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0069] , [0072] , [0078] - [0082]; figures 13-17 *
International search[Y]JPH0379401  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 1-7 * , claims; page 3, upper right column, lines 12 to 16; page 3, upper right column, line 19 to lower left column, line 8; page 3, lower left column, lines 11 to 12; page 5, upper right column, lines 18 to 20; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2012046025  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0084] to [0085], [0116], [0136] & US 2013/0206311 A1 paragraphs [0637] to [0638], [0704] to [0707], [0748] & EP 2610071 A1 & CN 103201121 A *;
 [Y]JP2014218065  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0002], [0003] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2012061893  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 7 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0048], [0057]; fig. 1 & US 2013/0139938 A1 claim 1; paragraphs [0167], [0178]; fig. 1 & EP 2602101 A1 & CN 103079802 A *;
 [A]JP2013252746  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]US4090547  (SCHMIDT OSKAR) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & GB 1502808 A *