Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3459761


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.09.2019 Amendment by applicant
26.07.2019 Change: Validation states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019 Change - extension states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
27.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
27.02.2019 Supplementary search report published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
22.02.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
22.02.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.02.2019 Request for examination filed published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
20.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
30.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
10.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
12.12.2018 Change - representative
12.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
01.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication