blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3458556

EP3458556 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING CALCIUM SULFONATE AND CALCIUM MAGNESIUM SULFONATE GREASES USING A DELAY AFTER ADDITION OF FACILITATING ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.05.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.02.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.02.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCH Corporation
2727 Chemsearch Drive
Irving, Texas 75062 / US
[2019/13]
Inventor(s)01 / WAYNICK, J., Andrew
8773 Cherry Lee Lane
Lantana, Texas 76226 / US
02 / GARZA, Jr., Joe, L.
2312 Castle Rock Rd.
Carrollton, Texas 75007 / US
 [2021/26]
Former [2019/13]01 / WAYNICK, J., Andrew
8773 Cherry Lee Lane
Lantana, TX 76226 / US
02 / GARZA, Jr., Joe, L.
2312 Castle Rock Rd.
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/13]
Application number, filing date17799948.915.05.2017
[2019/13]
WO2017US32678
Priority number, dateUS201662338193P18.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662338193 P
US20171559383912.05.2017         Original published format: US201715593839
[2019/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017200927
Date:23.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3458556
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3458556
Date:30.06.2021
Language:EN
[2021/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:C10M177/00, C10M121/04
[2019/26]
CPC:
C10M121/04 (EP,US); C10M135/10 (KR,US); C10M115/10 (KR,US);
C10M125/10 (KR,US); C10M125/24 (KR,US); C10M177/00 (EP,US);
C10M2201/062 (EP,KR,US); C10M2201/085 (EP,KR,US); C10M2203/1006 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2205/0285 (EP,KR,US); C10M2219/044 (EP,KR,US); C10M2219/046 (US);
C10M2219/0466 (EP,KR,US); C10N2010/04 (EP,KR,US); C10N2030/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/08 (EP,US); C10N2050/10 (EP,KR,US); C10N2070/00 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2019/13]C10M159/24, C10M135/10, C10M159/20, C10M169/04, C10M177/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CALCIUMSULFONAT- UND CALCIUMMAGNESIUMSULFONATSCHMIERFETT UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER VERZÖGERUNG NACH DER ZUGABE EINER BEGÜNSTIGENDEN SÄURE[2019/13]
English:COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING CALCIUM SULFONATE AND CALCIUM MAGNESIUM SULFONATE GREASES USING A DELAY AFTER ADDITION OF FACILITATING ACID[2019/13]
French:COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE GRAISSES DE SULFONATE DE CALCIUM ET DE SULFONATE DE MAGNÉSIUM-CALCIUM AU MOYEN D'UN TEMPS D'ATTENTE APRÈS L'ADDITION D'ACIDE FACILITANT[2019/13]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Search fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/13]
11.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2021Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.02.2021
08.02.2021Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
19.02.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2021Fee for grant paid
14.04.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.04.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)31.03.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CY30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
MK30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2024/20]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CY30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2023/19]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2023/06]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
MC30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/36]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
IT30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/29]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SI30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/26]AL30.06.2021
AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/21]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
DK30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/10]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
EE30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
PL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
IS30.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/09]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
RO30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SK30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
PT02.11.2021
Former [2022/08]AT30.06.2021
CZ30.06.2021
ES30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
Former [2022/07]AT30.06.2021
FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
NL30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
SM30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
Former [2021/51]FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
RS30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
Former [2021/49]FI30.06.2021
HR30.06.2021
LV30.06.2021
SE30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
NO30.09.2021
GR01.10.2021
Former [2021/47]FI30.06.2021
BG30.09.2021
Former [2021/46]FI30.06.2021
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3372114  (RENSE RUDOLPH J) [Y] 4,5,7,8,12,13 * column 1, line 15 - column 5, line 12 * * claim - *;
 [X]US9273265  (WAYNICK J ANDREW [US]) [X] 1,2,6,9-11,14,15 * column 2, line 60 - column 7, line 20 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 18 ** example -; claim - *;
 [XY]US2016115416  (WAYNICK J ANDREW [US]) [X] 1-3,6,9-11,14,15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0042] * * example -; claim - * [Y] 4,5,7,8,12,13
International search[A]US6432889  (KINOSHITA HIROTUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1-37* entire document *;
 [Y]US6596672  (CARRICK VIRGINIA A [US], et al) [Y] 21 * entire document *;
 [XY]US2016115416  (WAYNICK J ANDREW [US]) [X] 1-11, 23-25, 27-32, 34-37 * entire document * [Y] 21
by applicantUS3242079
 US3372115
 US3372114
 US3376222
 US3377283
 US3492231
 US3661622
 US3671012
 US3746643
 US3816310
 US4560489
 US4787992
 US4830767
 US4902435
 US4904399
 US4929371
 US5126062
 US5308514
 US5338467
 US2009305920
 CN101993767
 US9273265
 US2016115416
 US9458406
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.